AFT Local 2121 et al v. Accrediting Commission for Community and Junior Colleges
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Haywood S Gilliam, Jr |
Referred: | Kandis A Westmore |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-03411 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2016 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 03, 2017 1:05 AM PST |
Defendant
Scott Budnick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pamela Haynes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Danny Hawkins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gary Reed
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cecilia V Estolano
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tom Epstein
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Connie Conway
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andrew Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hasun Khan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Burdick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph J Bielanski
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Geoffrey L Baum
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arnoldo Avalos
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Accrediting Commission for Community and Junior Colleges
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jennifer Perry
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Valerie Lynn Shaw
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Erik E Skinner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nancy Sumner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deborah Malumed
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Tamara Lange
US District Court - ADR Unit 450 Golden Gate Ave., 16th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
|
Plaintiff
Karen Saginor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
San Jose-Evergreen Federation of Teachers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Palomar Faculty Federation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shanell Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alisa Messer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mendocino College Federation of Teachers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Lienhart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim Killikelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Augusta Goldstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
California Federation of Teachers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AFT Local 6322
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AFT Local 6161
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AFT Local 6157
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AFT Local 2121
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
121 | 121
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/15 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of State Defendants Without Prejudice by AFT Local 2121 (Goldsmith, Eileen) (Filed on 8/15/2017) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
120 | 120
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 08/14 8:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Telephonic Conference, previously set for August 15, 2017 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
119 | 119
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/11 2:00 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by AFT Local 2121. (Goldsmith, Eileen) (Filed on 8/11/2017) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
118 | 118
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 08/08 1:57 PM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 116 Stipulation for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims Against ACCJC Pursuant to Settlement Agreement. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017) |
|
117 | 117
order
Order
Tue 08/08 10:00 AM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., SETTING a telephonic case management conference at 3:00pm on August 15, 2017. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the status of the case with regard to the other Defendants in light of Plaintiffs' settlement with ACCJC 116 . Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 08/08 10:46 AM
Set Hearing Pursuant to Docket No. 117 : Telephone Conference set for 8/15/2017 03:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017) |