Milord Jean-Gilles Fritz Francois LLC
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Carla E Craig |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-40983 |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Milord Jean-Gilles Fritz Francois LLC
1499 Saint Johns Pl
Brooklyn, NY 11213-3910 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 6:06 PM EDT |
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 05/22 2:11 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ads) |
||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal
Sat 04/01 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Notice Date 03/31/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal
Wed 03/29 8:18 AM
Order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal . Signed on 3/28/2017 (ads) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned BK)
Fri 03/24 10:44 AM
Hearing Held; - Appearance : William Curtin from the Office of the United States Trustee - Appearance: William Curtin from the Office of the United States Trustee Marked Off, It is So Ordered, By The Honorable Carla E. Craig. Endorsed on 3/24/17 calendar. (This is a text Order, no document attached) (tleonard) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Fri 03/24 10:45 AM
Hearing Held; - Appearance: William Curtin from the Office of the United States Trustee - No Opposition - Granted; Court to Issue Order (tleonard) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Tue 03/21 6:02 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Jerold C Feuerstein on behalf of Eastern Savings Bank, FSB (Feuerstein, Jerold) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 03/21 5:53 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jerold C Feuerstein on behalf of Eastern Savings Bank, FSB (Feuerstein, Jerold) |
|
Sunday, March 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order
Mon 03/13 1:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 03/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges
Fri 03/10 4:10 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 3/10/2017 Status hearing to be held on 3/22/2017 at 04:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (tml) |
|
Saturday, March 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Sun 03/05 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 03/04/2017. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing Ch. 11
Sun 03/05 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing - Chapter 11 Non-Individual Notice Date 03/04/2017. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sun 03/05 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/04/2017. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing
Sun 03/05 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Notice Date 03/04/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
Notice of Hearing of Defective or Deficient Filing of Non-Individual Chapter 11 Case
Thu 03/02 4:25 PM
Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for debtor's failure to be represented by counsel. Hearing scheduled for 3/22/2017 at 04:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. Chapter 11 Non-Individual Attorney Cure due by 3/16/2017. (cjm) |
|
5 | 5
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thu 03/02 4:24 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/10/2017 at 04:00 PM at Room 2579, 271-C Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY. (cjm) |
|
4 | 4
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Thu 03/02 10:58 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 : Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 3/2/2017.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 3/2/2017. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 3/2/2017. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 3/2/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 3/2/2017. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 3/2/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 3/16/2017. Schedule A/B due 3/16/2017. Schedule D due 3/16/2017. Schedule E/F due 3/16/2017. Schedule G due 3/16/2017. Schedule H due 3/16/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 3/16/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/16/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 3/16/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 3/16/2017. (cjm) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 03/02 10:50 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1717 Filed by Milord Jean-Gilles Fritz Francois LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 6/30/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 6/30/2017. (cjm) |
|
court
Prior Filings
Thu 03/02 10:51 AM
[LINK:Prior Filing] Case Number(s): 14-43918 cec dismissed 11/14/14, 16-43302 cec dismissed 9/21/16, 16-44964 cec dismissed 1/17/17 (cjm) |
||
utility
~Force Judge Assignment
Thu 03/02 10:52 AM
Judge Assigned Due to Prior Filing, Judge Reassigned. (cjm) |
||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Thu 03/02 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1717.00. Receipt Number 315909. (CM) (admin) |