Roy Payan, et al v. Los Angeles Community College District, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01697 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jun 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 29, 2017 2:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Community College District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Francisco C Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Portia Mason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Payan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The National Federation of the Blind of California, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The National Federation of the Blind, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
628 | 628
order
Leave
Fri 04/19 3:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Request for Remote Appearance of Out-Of-State Counsel by Judge Stephen V. Wilson that Plaintiffs' request627 is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that out-of-state counsel for Plaintiffs may appear remotely at the hearing scheduled for 5/13/2024, at 1:30 PM. (jp) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
627 | 627
motion
Leave
Mon 04/15 6:42 AM
REQUEST to Participate by Zoom of Out-of-State Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Portia Mason, Roy Payan, The National Federation of the Blind of California, Inc., The National Federation of the Blind, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 5/13/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Docherty, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jessica P. Weber, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Kevin D. Docherty, | ||
Att: 3 [PROPOSED] Order re Request for Remote Appearance - JMOL Hearing |