Lynn's Market, Inc.
Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Henry W Van Eck |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-00864 |
Case Filed: | Mar 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Lynn's Market, Inc.
5660 York Rd
New Oxford, PA 17350-9394 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
228 Walnut Street, Suite 1190
Harrisburg, PA 17101 |
Docket last updated: 03/02/2017 7:00 PM EST |
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Fri 03/03 2:02 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1:17-bk-00864) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 8266037, amount $ 1717.00. . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 03/03 2:00 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $1717.00. Filed by Lawrence V. Young of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Lynn's Market, Inc.. (Young, Lawrence) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)
Fri 03/03 2:01 PM
Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Lawrence V. Young of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Lynn's Market, Inc. . (Young, Lawrence) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee)
Fri 03/03 2:19 PM
Application to Employ CGA Law Firm and Lawrence V. Young, Esquire as Attorney. Filed by Lawrence V. Young of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Lynn's Market, Inc.. (Young, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Disinterestedness | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
motion
Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee)
Fri 03/03 2:27 PM
Application to Employ Alex Everhart as Consultant. Filed by Lawrence V. Young of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Lynn's Market, Inc.. (Young, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Curriculum Vitae | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Disinterestedness | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Fee Agreement | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Chapter 11 First Day Motion
Fri 03/03 2:48 PM
Chapter 11 First Day Motion re: Emergency, Ex-Parte Motion for Approval to Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries and Employee Medical and Similar Benefits Filed by Lawrence V. Young of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Lynn's Market, Inc.. (Young, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
order
Hearing (Ex. Hearing, Conference, Preliminary Hearing, Status Conference, Pre-Trial Conference)
Fri 03/03 3:56 PM
Order setting Hearing Emergency, Ex-Parte Motion for Approval to Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries and Employee Medical and Similar Benefits. . Hearing scheduled for 3/9/2017 at 10:00 AM at 3rd & Walnut Sts, Bankruptcy Courtroom (3rd Fl), Ronald Reagan Federal Building, Harrisburg, PA17101. (Irving, Beth) |