Fit Dog, LLC
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mark X Mullin |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40857 |
Case Filed: | Mar 03, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 09, 2017 |
Debtor
Fit Dog, LLC
PO Box 61027
Potomac, MD 20859-1027 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Shawn K. Brown
Chapter 7 Trustee PO Box 93749
Southlake, TX 76092 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 03/04/2017 12:06 AM CST |
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 03/03 4:33 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 7) 17-40857 7) [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00). Receipt number 23393836, amount $ 335.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer)
Fri 03/03 3:49 PM
Non-individual Chapter 7 voluntary petition. (with Disclosure Compensation of Attorney for Debtor and Verification of Mailing List) Fee Amount $335 Filed by Fit Dog, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign
Fri 03/03 11:45 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/09/2017 at 09:00 AM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. (Admin, ) |