JOE D'S LOUNGE, INC.
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Pat E Morgenstern-Clarren |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11136 |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
JOE D'S LOUNGE, INC.
13411 Miles Ave
Cleveland, OH 44105-5523 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago |
Sunday, May 21, 2017 | ||
court
ADI Returned Mail
Mon 05/22 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 04/16/2017 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf727 to: CHASE CORPORATION 10790 RANCHO BERNARD San Diego, CA 92127-5705. (ADIrm adi) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 04/18 2:03 PM
Case Closed. (pzeho) |
|
Sunday, April 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
BNC
Notice of Order to Dismiss Case
Mon 04/17 11:15 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/16/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Dismissing Case (PDF)
Fri 04/14 2:24 PM
Order Dismissing Case Signed on 4/14/2017 |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 04/13 1:54 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case - Unopposed Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (ust06, Maria D. Giannirakis tr) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Thu 04/13 11:00 AM
Hearing Held |
||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Motion
Mon 04/10 4:44 PM
Notice of Motion of United States Trustee for Entry of an Order Pursuant to (A) 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b) Dismissing Debtor's Chapter 11 Case; and (B) 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Rule 2016(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Directing Debtor's Counsel to File a Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee . (ust401, Tiiara N. A. Patton tr) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 04/10 4:42 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case - Motion of United States Trustee for Entry of an Order Pursuant to (A) 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b) Dismissing Debtor's Chapter 11 Case; and (B) 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Rule 2016(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Directing Debtor's Counsel to File a Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (ust401, Tiiara N. A. Patton tr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice
Thu 03/30 2:31 PM
Status Conference Partially Held and Adjourned. |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
trustee
Notice of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee
Mon 03/27 3:02 PM
Notice of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee Filed by United States Trustee.(ust07, Sharon Nollsch tr) |
|
Sunday, March 26, 2017 | ||
court
ADI Returned Mail
Mon 03/27 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 03/10/2017 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf873 to: CHASE CORPORATION 10790 RANCHO BERNARD San Diego, CA 92127-5705. (ADIrm adi) |
||
court
ADI Returned Mail
Mon 03/27 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 03/12/2017 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form 309F to: CHASE CORPORATION 10790 RANCHO BERNARD San Diego, CA 92127-5705. (ADIrm adi) |
||
Sunday, March 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
BNC
Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors
Mon 03/13 1:20 AM
Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, March 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
BNC
Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF)
Sun 03/12 12:23 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Notice Date 03/11/2017. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
BNC
Notice of Order (PDF)
Sun 03/12 12:23 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/11/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
BNC
Notice of Order on Motion to Transfer Case Out of District
Sat 03/11 5:20 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Transfer Case Out of District w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/10/2017. (Admin.) |
|
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Corp
Fri 03/10 9:39 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/17/2017 at 10:30 AM at Office of US Trustee, 341 meeting, 6th Floor, H.M.M.. Filed by United States Trustee.(ust19, PS tr) |
||
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Set Hearing (PDF)
Thu 03/09 11:52 AM
Order Setting Status Conference. Signed on 3/9/2017 |
|
6 | 6
order
Order (PDF)
Thu 03/09 11:48 AM
Standing Order in Chapter 11 Cases: Order with Respect to Professionals Appearing in Case. Signed on 3/9/2017 |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Transfer Case (bk)
Wed 03/08 10:39 AM
--DUPLICATE, ENTERED IN ERROR-- Order Transferring Bankruptcy Case to Judge Pat E. Morgenstern-Clarren. Signed on 3/8/2017. (pzeho crt) Modified on 3/8/2017 (pzeho) |
|
4 | 4
order
Transfer Case (bk)
Wed 03/08 10:34 AM
Order Transferring Bankruptcy Case to Judge Pat E. Morgenstern-Clarren. Signed on 3/8/2017. (pzeho crt) |
|
court
Case Reassigned
Wed 03/08 10:39 AM
Judge PAT E MORGENSTERN-CLARREN added to case. Involvement of Judge ARTHUR I HARRIS Terminated (pzeho) |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
court
ADI List of Creditors Uploaded
Tue 03/07 8:30 AM
List of Creditors File Uploaded (ADILstUpd) |
||
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 03/06 1:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Tiiara N. A. Patton Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (Patton, Tiiara tr) |
|
2 | 2
court
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Mon 03/06 8:50 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor JOE D'S LOUNGE, INC.. (Thomas, Sam aty) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/06 8:31 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by JOE D'S LOUNGE, INC. (Thomas, Sam aty) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 03/06 8:34 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11136 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 35482295. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |