Patriot Solar Group, LLC
Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Gregg |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-00984 |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Patriot Solar Group, LLC
1007 Industrial Blvd
Albion, MI 49224-8551 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Michigan Unemployment Insurance Agency
|
|
Creditor
Shape Corp.
|
|
Creditor
State of Michigan - Department of Treasury
|
|
Creditor
The Hanover Insurance Company
|
|
Creditor
The Huntington National Bank
|
|
Creditor
Vanguard Energy Partners, LLC
|
|
Debtor
Patriot Solar
|
|
Debtor
Patriot Solar Group, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Michigan Energy Options
|
|
U.S. Trustee
Dean E. Rietberg
|
Docket last updated: 03/05/2017 7:00 PM EST |
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 03/06 5:30 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-00984 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 12933975, amount $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Notice To File Declaration Re: ECF (ADI)
Mon 03/06 11:58 PM
Electronic Notice to Debtor(s) Counsel to File Conventionally with the Court Debtor(s) Declaration Re: ECF Within Seven Days from the Date of Filing or Case will be Dismissed Without Prejudice Pursuant to ECF Guidelines. To obtain a copy of this form, please go to: http://www.miwb.uscourts.gov/forms/declaration-re-electronic-filing (ADI) |
||
1 | 1
14
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/06 5:30 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Patriot Solar Group, LLC Schedule A/B due 03/20/2017. Schedule D due 03/20/2017. Schedule E/F due 03/20/2017. Schedule G due 03/20/2017. Schedule H due 03/20/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 03/20/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 03/20/2017. Attorney Disclosure Statement due 03/20/2017. (Knight, Cody) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Atty. for Debtor - BR 2016 Statement
Mon 03/06 5:32 PM
BR 2016 Disclosure of Compensation for Cody H. Knight, Debtor's Attorney, Fees: $17283.00; Awarded on 3/6/2017 Filed by Debtor Patriot Solar Group, LLC (Knight, Cody) |
|
8 | 8
utility
Notice of Filing(s) Due Intake (Amended)
Tue 03/07 1:31 PM
Notice of Filing(s) Due. Chp 11 Filings Due 3/20/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury Due 3/20/2017. (dr) |