Almarse, LLC
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mindy A Mora |
Case #: | 9:17-bk-12683 |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 10, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2023 |
Debtor
Almarse, LLC
1900 Glades Rd Ste 358
Boca Raton, FL 33431-7333 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Nicole Testa Mehdipour
United States Bankruptcy Trustee 200 East Broward Blvd. Suite 1110
Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 03/07/2017 12:02 AM EST |
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 03/06 1:42 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-12683 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29374342. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]
Mon 03/06 1:39 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $335] (Ditocco, Anthony) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset)
Mon 03/06 1:39 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 04/10/2017 at 09:00 AM at 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 870, West Palm Beach. Proofs of Claim due by 07/10/2017. (Ditocco, Anthony) |
|
3 | 3
attydoc
Disclosure of Compensation
Mon 03/06 1:39 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Anthony Ditocco. (Ditocco, Anthony) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 03/06 1:40 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Almarse, LLC. (Ditocco, Anthony) |