CUTLER v. GREEN et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas N Oneill, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00984 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 30, 2017 5:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
SELECTED PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC OFFICIALS
|
|
Defendant
RON MARTIN
|
|
Defendant
WGAL
|
|
Plaintiff
JEFFREY CUTLER
EAST LAMPETER TOWNSHIP ELECTED TAX COLLECTOR P.O. BOX 2806
YORK, PA 17405 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
AMBER GREEN
Terminated: 07/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RALPH HUTCHINSON
Terminated: 07/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHRISTINA HAUSNER
Terminated: 07/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JUDGE MARGARET MILLER
Terminated: 07/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 11/29 10:58 AM
ORDER of USCA as to46 that, On consideration whereof, it is now hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED by this Court that the judgment of the District Court entered on July 21, 2017 be, and the same is, hereby affirmed, etc. (ti, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Tue 08/08 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re46 Notice of Appeal filed by JEFFREY CUTLER. USCA Case Number 17-2709 (dmc, ) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 08/04 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re45 Order by JEFFREY CUTLER. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 163714. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and JEFFREY CUTLER. Certificate of Service. (ti, ) Modified on 8/4/2017 (lisad, ) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 07/21 1:12 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS BY PLAINTIFF JEFFREY CUTLER FOR RECONSIDERATION, DKT NO.42 AND FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, DKT. NO.44 ARE DENIED. THIS MATTER SHALL REMAIN CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 7/21/17.7/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 07/17 2:54 PM
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY JEFFREY CUTLER. AFFIDAVIT.(ahf) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/17 2:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph Martin re: served Summons and Complaint upon WGAL by Personal on 7/14/2017. (ahf) |
|
42 | 42
motion
Reconsideration
Mon 07/17 9:37 AM
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED BY JEFFREY CUTLER.(ahf) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order
Wed 07/12 4:43 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION BY PLAINTIFF JEFFREY CUTLER "TO COMBINE CASES (CI 17-00210 AND CI 17-1626 AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT," DKT. NO.38 IS DENIED. THIS MATTER SHALL REMAIN CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 7/12/17. 7/12/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(ti, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Tue 07/11 10:05 AM
ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS BY PLAINTIFF JEFFREY CUTLER ARE DENIED (1) MOTION TO COMBINE CASES AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DKT. NO.21 ; (2) MOTION TO COMBINE CASES AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DKT. NO.32 ; (3) MOTION TO COMBINE CASES AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DKT. NO.35 ; AND (4) MOTION TO COMBINE CASES AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT, DKT. NO.37 ; DEFENDANT RALPH HUTCHINSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS, DKT. NO.14 , IS GRANTED; DEFENDANT HONORABLE MARGARET MILLER'S MOTION TO DISMISS, DKT. NO.19 , IS GRANTED; THE MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANTS AMBER GREEN AND CHRISTINA HAUSNER, DKT. NO.34 , IS GRANTED; PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED IN THEIR ENTIRETY; AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 7/10/17. 7/11/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
39 | 39
25
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Tue 07/11 10:00 AM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 7/10/17. 7/11/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Consolidate Cases Summary Judgment
Tue 07/11 9:11 AM
MOTION TO COMBINE CASES (CI 17-00210 AND CI 17-01626 AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by JEFFREY CUTLER.(ti, ) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Consolidate Cases
Fri 06/16 8:38 AM
MOTION TO COMBINE (1:17-CV-01074) AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT together with Certificate of Service filed by JEFFREY CUTLER.(ti, ) |
|
36 | 36
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 06/15 11:54 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re35 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (0:16-CV-61511) and Summary Judgment filed by AMBER GREEN, CHRISTINA HAUSNER. (MOSER, LAUREN) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Consolidate Cases
Thu 06/01 3:41 PM
MOTION TO COMBINE CASES (0:16-CV-61511) AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT together with Certificate of Service filed by JEFFREY CUTLER.(ti, ) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Dismiss
Fri 05/26 11:48 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by AMBER GREEN, CHRISTINA HAUSNER.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(GONZALES, JOHN) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 05/16 12:33 PM
MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition re32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RALPH HUTCHINSON. Certificate of Service. (MILLER, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/16/2017 (lisad, ) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Consolidate Cases Summary Judgment
Fri 05/12 11:04 AM
MOTION TO COMBINE CASES (1:17-CV-02726) AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT, with Certificate of Service , filed by JEFFREY CUTLER. (aeg) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 05/04 12:55 PM
RESPONSE to Opposition to21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEFFREY CUTLER. Certificate of Service. (ti, ) Modified on 5/5/2017 (lisad, ) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 05/04 9:16 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMBER GREEN, CHRISTINA HAUSNER. (GONZALES, JOHN) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respoth
Response
Mon 05/01 4:54 PM
ADDENDUM TO RESPONSE TO JUDGE'S ORDER OF 10APR2017 AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT by JEFFREY CUTLER. (aeg) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/01 10:47 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MARGARET MILLER. (COVAL, ANDREW) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/01 9:52 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JEFFREY CUTLER (kp, ) |
|
26 | 26
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 05/01 9:51 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by JOSEPH MARTIN re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon JUDGE MARGARET MILLER, RALPH HUTCHINSON by PERSONAL on 4/20/2017 (kp, ) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 04/28 9:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph Martin re: served Summons & Complaint by Personal Service upon WGAL on 4/19/17, Margaret Miller, Ralph Hutchinson on 4/20/17. (fdc) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 04/27 1:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RALPH HUTCHINSON. (GILLIGAN, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 04/27 1:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RALPH HUTCHINSON.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GILLIGAN, CHRISTOPHER) *FILED IN ERROR; SEE DOC.24 FOR RE-FILED RESPONSE* Modified on 4/27/2017 (lisad, ) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respoth
Response
Thu 04/20 4:58 PM
Response to Judge's Order of 10Mar2017 and Summary Judgment by JEFFREY CUTLER. (ti, ) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Consolidate Cases Summary Judgment
Thu 04/20 3:39 PM
MOTION TO COMBINE CASES (2:17-CV-00984) AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by JEFFREY CUTLER.(ti, ) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Mon 04/10 2:37 PM
ORDER THAT THE 3/27/2017 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE ORDER AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES7 , AND THE ADDENDUM FILED ON 4/3/2017,8 , ARE DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL, IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 7.1(c) OF THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST HIM14 , ON OR BEFORE 4/20/2017, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 4/10/17.4/10/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/10 12:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARGARET MILLER.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(COVAL, ANDREW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mandamus Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Aff. of Service | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/10 2:38 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines(ti, ) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 04/06 3:35 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jeffrey Cutler re: service of Summons and Complaint upon MARGARET MILLER by Personal Service on 3/17/17 (ti, ) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. GILLIGAN on behalf of RALPH HUTCHINSON (GILLIGAN, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL RONALD MILLER on behalf of RALPH HUTCHINSON (MILLER, MICHAEL) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Praecipe/Request
Thu 04/06 1:33 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS by JEFFREY CUTLER. (ti, ) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 04/06 12:11 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by RALPH HUTCHINSON.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MILLER, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum Defendants' Memo of Law | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL RONALD MILLER on behalf of RALPH HUTCHINSON (MILLER, MICHAEL) *ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE WITH COMPLETE PDF* Modified on 4/6/2017 (lisad, ) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. GILLIGAN on behalf of RALPH HUTCHINSON (GILLIGAN, CHRISTOPHER) *ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE WITH COMPLETE PDF* Modified on 4/6/2017 (lisad, ) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/06 1:37 PM
Alias Summons Issued as to RALPH HUTCHINSON, RON MARTIN, MARGARET MILLER, WGAL. Four Originals Given To: Jeffrey Cutler on 04/06/2017 (ti, ) |
||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/04 3:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTINA HAUSNER, AMBER GREEN. AMBER GREEN waiver sent on 3/27/2017, answer due 5/26/2017, CHRISTINA HAUSNER waiver sent on 3/27/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. (GONZALES, JOHN) Modified on 4/4/2017 (lisad, ) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/04 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN A. MOSER on behalf of AMBER GREEN, CHRISTINA HAUSNER with Certificate of Service(MOSER, LAUREN) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/04 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. GONZALES on behalf of AMBER GREEN, CHRISTINA HAUSNER with Certificate of Service(GONZALES, JOHN) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 04/04 10:20 AM
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE ORDER AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR EXTRODINARY CIRCUMSTANCES ADDENDUM together with Certificate of Service filed by JEFFREY CUTLER.(ti, ) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Reconsideration
Mon 03/27 2:38 PM
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE ORDER AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR EXTRODINARY CIRCUMSTANCES together with Certificate of Service filed by JEFFREY CUTLER.(ti, ) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/24 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW J. COVAL on behalf of MARGARET MILLER with 03/24/17(COVAL, ANDREW) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Thu 03/23 9:31 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE ORDER AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT3 BY PLAINTIFF JEFFREY CUTLER, WHO IS PROCEEDING PRO SE, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 3/22/17. 3/22/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(ti, ) |
|
4 | 4
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Thu 03/23 9:30 AM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 3/22/17. 3/23/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(ti, ) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Vacate Summary Judgment
Tue 03/21 10:25 AM
EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE ORDER AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by JEFFREY CUTLER.(ti, ) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 03/09 3:17 PM
AMMENDED COMPLAINT OF EMERGENCY PETITION OF COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF and SUMMARY JUDGMENT and MOTION TO COMBINE CASES together with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by JEFFREY CUTLER.(ti, ) Modified on 3/9/2017 (ti, ) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/10 11:48 AM
Summons Issued as to AMBER GREEN, CHRISTINA HAUSNER, RALPH HUTCHINSON, RON MARTIN, MARGARET MILLER, WGAL. Six Originals Forwarded To: Pro Se on 3/10/17 (ti, ) |
||
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/06 9:22 AM
EMERGENCY PETITION OF COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO COMBINE CASES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 155798.), filed by JEFFREY CUTLER.(tj, ) |
|
Att: 1 Petition-2, | ||
Att: 2 Petition-3, | ||
Att: 3 Petition-4, | ||
Att: 4 Petition-5, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheets | ||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/06 9:23 AM
Summons 2 Issued as to AMBER GREEN, RALPH HUTCHINSON. Forwarded To: Pro Se on 3/6/17 (tj, ) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 03/06 9:24 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JEFFREY CUTLER. (tj, ) |