Sam-On-Demand, LLC
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-80268 |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 12, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $50,001 to $100,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Sam-On-Demand, LLC
4640 Washington Ave
Omaha, NE 68152-5223 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Patricia Fahey
U.S. Trustee's Office 111 So 18th Plz Suite 1148
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Docket last updated: 03/05/2017 6:00 PM CST |
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/06 2:46 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/4/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 07/4/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 03/20/2017. Filed by Patrick Raymond Turner of Stinson Leonard Street LLP on behalf of Sam-On-Demand, LLC.(Turner, Patrick) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 03/06 2:47 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-80268 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 7095356, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Verification of Matrix
Mon 03/06 2:48 PM
Debtor's Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Patrick Raymond Turner on behalf of Sam-On-Demand, LLC. (Turner, Patrick) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Mon 03/06 2:50 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Patrick Raymond Turner on behalf of Sam-On-Demand, LLC. (Turner, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of D. Mansfield | ||
5 | 5
trustee
UST Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Corporation
Mon 03/06 5:27 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/12/2017 at 11:30 AM at Omaha's 341 Meeting Room. Proofs of Claims due by 7/11/2017. (Jensen, Jerry) |