Chasing Shakespeare Productions, LLC
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Scott W Everett |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-30845 |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2023 |
Debtor
Chasing Shakespeare Productions, LLC
3509 Boca Raton Drive
Dallas, TX 75230 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Daniel J. Sherman
509 N. Montclair
Dallas, TX 75208 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 03/07/2017 12:03 AM CST |
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 03/06 3:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 7) 17-30845 7) [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00). Receipt number 23401860, amount $ 335.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer)
Mon 03/06 3:40 PM
Non-individual Chapter 7 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Chasing Shakespeare Productions, LLC (Berghman, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
10
pgs
misc
Schedules
Mon 03/06 3:45 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Chasing Shakespeare Productions, LLC. (Berghman, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Statement of financial affairs
Mon 03/06 3:48 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Chasing Shakespeare Productions, LLC. (Berghman, Thomas) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for a Non-individual
Mon 03/06 3:55 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors filed by Debtor Chasing Shakespeare Productions, LLC. (Berghman, Thomas) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor
Mon 03/06 4:01 PM
Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor . Filed by Debtor Chasing Shakespeare Productions, LLC. (Berghman, Thomas) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Statement of corporate ownership
Mon 03/06 4:05 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. filed by Debtor Chasing Shakespeare Productions, LLC. (Berghman, Thomas) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Matrix
Mon 03/06 4:15 PM
Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor Chasing Shakespeare Productions, LLC. (Berghman, Thomas) |
|
8 | 8
court
Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign
Mon 03/06 11:45 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/19/2017 at 09:00 AM at Dallas 341 Rm 524. (Admin, ) |