NRT Advisory, LLC
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John K Olson |
Case #: | 0:17-bk-12741 |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 12, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Debtor
NRT Advisory, LLC
4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 555S
Hollywood, FL 33021-6853 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Chad S. Paiva
trustee@gmlaw.com 525 Okeechobee Blvd., Suite 1570
West Palm Beach, FL 33401 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 03/08/2017 12:03 AM EST |