AVX Corporation v. Kim
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Geiger Lewis |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00624 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2017 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
JunHee Kim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AVX Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order for Distribution of Funds ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 12/14 12:01 PM
ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION of Funds, granting 36 Consent MOTION for Release of Funds. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/14/2022. (cbru, ) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2022 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Release of Funds
Fri 12/09 4:43 PM
Consent MOTION for Release of Funds by AVX Corporation. Response to Motion due by 12/28/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Lightsey, Wallace) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Consent Order for Release of Held Funds | ||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/28 2:37 PM
CONSENT ORDER permitting Reliance to delete the Mirror Image Copies. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/28/2017. (abuc) (Main Document 35 replaced on 9/28/2017) (abuc, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 06/28 4:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by AVX Corporation. (Wilson, William) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order
Fri 06/02 10:54 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 6/2/2017. (abuc) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
misc
Non-Standard Item Received
Mon 05/15 4:01 PM
REMAINING SEIZED ITEMS RETURNED. (abuc) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
misc
Non-Standard Item Received
Thu 04/27 12:33 PM
SEIZED ITEMS RETURNED.(abuc) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/25 2:05 PM
CONSENT ORDER modifying 24 Order re: forensic examination of the Defendant's devices that were seized by the U.S. Marshals. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/25/17. (jtho, ) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice Other
Fri 04/07 10:05 AM
NOTICE re: Confidentiality Order. (jtho, ) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice Other
Fri 04/07 10:04 AM
NOTICE re: Confidentiality Order. (jtho, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Confidentiality Order
Tue 04/04 8:35 AM
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/4/17. (jtho, ) |
|
24 | 24
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/04 8:32 AM
ORDER re: forensic examination of devices that were seized by the U.S. Marshals Service. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/4/17. (jtho, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
4
pgs
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/29 4:33 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by AVX Corporation. (Lightsey, Wallace) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 03/23 5:16 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by JunHee Kim.(Hutson, Melvin) |
|
21 | 21
order
Mediation Order
Thu 03/23 9:59 AM
MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 12/4/2017, Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/23/2017. (abuc) |
|
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 03/23 9:58 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/12/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/26/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 4/26/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/22/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/20/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/20/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/20/2017, Discovery due by 9/18/2017, Motion in Limine due by 12/13/2017, Motions due by 10/3/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/18/2017, Jury Selection Deadline 1/3/2018, Mediation Due by 12/4/2017, Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/23/2017. (abuc) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice Other
Thu 03/23 9:03 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant is reminded that Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories are to be filed when a party first appears in a case. Please file no later than 4/6/2017. (abuc) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/22 3:22 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by JunHee Kim.(Hutson, Melvin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit L-1A Visa Petition | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Document Mailed
Fri 03/17 10:25 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED 14 Order on Motion to Continue placed in U.S. Mail to JunHee Kim. (jtho, ) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Fri 03/17 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: 3/20/17 status conference. (jtho, ) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 03/17 10:19 AM
TEXT ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant's motion to continue the hearing in this matter 13 while he endeavors to secure counsel. The relevant statute provides the hearing should be held within seven days of the Court's issuance of the Amended Seizure and Temporary Restraining Order 11 "unless [Defendant] consent[s]" to a later date. 18 U.S.C. § 1836(b)(2)(B)(v). Further, Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2) states a Temporary Restraining Order will expire fourteen days after its entry "unless [Defendant] consents to a longer extension" Here, Defendant has consented to a later date for a hearing in this matter, which necessarily means he has consented to a longer extension of the Order. Therefore, Defendant's motion to continue is GRANTED. Consequently, the Court's Order will remain in effect and the hearing in this matter will be delayed until further Order by this Court. Within five days of when Defendant's attorney makes an appearance in this matter, counsel shall (1) conference in a good faith effort to resolve this matter without further Court intervention and (2) file a joint status report with the Court as to whether or not they have succeeded. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/17/17.(jtho, ) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
motion
Continue
Fri 03/17 7:42 AM
MOTION to Continue 3/20/17 hearing by JunHee Kim. Response to Motion due by 3/30/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(jtho, ) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
4
pgs
misc
Receipt
Tue 03/14 8:01 AM
RECEIPT for property seized 3/13/17. (jtho, ) |
|
11 | 11
11
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/13 11:48 AM
AMENDED ORDER re 8 Order on Motion for Ex Parte Civil Seizure, Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Hearing. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/13/17. (jtho, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 03/08 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference re: seizure of property set for 3/20/2017 11:00 AM in Greenville #3, Clement F Haynsworth Fed Bldg, 300 E Washington St, Greenville before Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis. (jtho, ) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Receipt
Wed 03/08 1:30 PM
RECEIPT SCX600007491 for $10,000.00 security per8 Order. (kmca) |
|
8 | 8
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Hearing
Wed 03/08 11:28 AM
ORDER granting 4 Motion Entry of Civil Seizure; granting 4 Motion for TRO; granting 6 Motion for Hearing; granting 6 Motion Entry of Proposed Order. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/8/17.(alew, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/07 5:00 PM
Summons Issued as to JunHee Kim. (alew, ) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Hearing Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/07 4:59 PM
MOTION for Hearing, MOTION Entry of Proposed Order re4 MOTION for Ex Parte Civil Seizure, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Response to Motion due by 3/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. by AVX Corporation. No proposed order.(alew, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Consultation on Motion
Tue 03/07 4:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL by AVX Corporation re4 MOTION for Ex Parte Civil Seizure MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (alew, ) |
|
4 | 4
19
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 03/07 4:53 PM
MOTION for Ex Parte Civil Seizure, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by AVX Corporation. Response to Motion due by 3/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(alew, ) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 03/07 4:49 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by AVX Corporation.(alew, ) |
|
1 | 1
24
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/07 4:48 PM
COMPLAINT against JunHee Kim ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7037206.), filed by AVX Corporation. Service due by 6/5/2017(alew, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Employment Agreement on Non-Disclosure and Industrial Property Rights, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Confidentiality and Non-Competition Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Technology Acknowledgment and Consent.PDF |