Quantum Relocation Services, LLC
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Harlin Dewayne Hale |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-30893 |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 02, 2018 |
Debtor
Quantum Relocation Services, LLC, Debtor
15110 Dallas Pkwy Ste 102
Dallas, TX 75248-4601 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Daniel J. Sherman
509 N. Montclair
Dallas, TX 75208 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 03/08/2017 12:02 AM CST |
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Tue 03/07 5:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 7) 17-30893 7) [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00). Receipt number 23410470, amount $ 335.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign
Tue 03/07 5:55 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/19/2017 at 09:50 AM at Dallas 341 Rm 524. (Castillo, Mark) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer)
Tue 03/07 12:52 PM
Non-individual Chapter 7 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Quantum Relocation Services, LLC (Castillo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Corporate Resolution | ||
2 | 2
misc
Schedules
Tue 03/07 1:35 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Quantum Relocation Services, LLC. (Assink, Bryan) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for a Non-individual
Tue 03/07 1:44 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors filed by Debtor Quantum Relocation Services, LLC. (Assink, Bryan) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Statement of financial affairs
Tue 03/07 1:52 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Quantum Relocation Services, LLC. (Assink, Bryan) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Statement of corporate ownership
Tue 03/07 1:55 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. filed by Debtor Quantum Relocation Services, LLC. (Assink, Bryan) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor
Tue 03/07 1:58 PM
Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor . Filed by Debtor Quantum Relocation Services, LLC. (Assink, Bryan) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Matrix
Tue 03/07 2:18 PM
Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor Quantum Relocation Services, LLC. (Assink, Bryan) |