Hemp Industries Association, et al v. USDEA
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-ag-70650 |
Type | agency / review / san francisco northern ca |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 1:20 PM PDT |
Petitioner
HEMP INDUSTRIES ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
ALL-ON-GOD-FAITH, INC., dba Dr. Bronner's Magic Soaps
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
ATLAS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
NATURE'S PATH FOODS USA INC.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
HEMP OIL CANADA,INC.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
HEMPZELS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
KENEX LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
TIERRA MADRE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
RUTH'S HEMP FOODS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
ORGANIC CONSUMERS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/12/2017 1:20 PM PDT |
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/13/2017. Petitioner brief due 04/27/2017 for All-On-God-Faith, Inc., Atlas Corporation, Hemp Industries Association, Hemp Oil Canada,Inc., Hempzels, Inc., Kenex Ltd., Nature's Path Foods USA Inc., Organic Consumers Association, Ruth's Hemp Foods, Inc. and Tierra Madre, LLC. Respondent brief due 05/30/2017 for U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10344536] (BY) [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:54 PM] | |
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 Filed (ECF) Petitioners All-On-God-Faith, Inc., Atlas Corporation, Hemp Industries Association, Hemp Oil Canada,Inc., Hempzels, Inc., Kenex Ltd., Nature's Path Foods USA Inc., Organic Consumers Association, Ruth's Hemp Foods, Inc. and Tierra Madre, LLC Motion for miscellaneous relief [Withdrawal of Motion for Order to Show Cause]. Date of service: 02/08/2017. [10345048] --[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed incorrectly in case 03-71366 ] (TYL) [Entered: 03/06/2017 03:26 PM] | |
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 Filed (ECF) Petitioners All-On-God-Faith, Inc., Atlas Corporation, Hemp Industries Association, Hemp Oil Canada,Inc., Hempzels, Inc., Kenex Ltd., Nature's Path Foods USA Inc., Organic Consumers Association, Ruth's Hemp Foods, Inc. and Tierra Madre, LLC Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Respondent Drug Enforcement Administration Should not be Found in Contempt of Court for Failure to Comply with this Court's Injunction]. Date of service: 03/01/2017. [10345064] --[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed incorrectly in case 03-71366 ] (TYL) [Entered: 03/06/2017 03:29 PM] | |
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sarah Wendy Carroll for Respondent USDEA. Date of service: 03/02/2017. [10345068] --[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed incorrectly in case 03-71366 ] (TYL) [Entered: 03/06/2017 03:30 PM] | |
5 | 5 Filed (ECF) Respondent USDEA Unopposed Motion to extend time to file opposition until 03/28/2017. Date of service: 03/02/2017. [10345075] --[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed incorrectly in case 03-71366 ] (TYL) [Entered: 03/06/2017 03:32 PM] | |
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 Added attorney Sarah W. Carroll for USDEA, in case 17-70650 [10345221] (RR) [Entered: 03/06/2017 04:21 PM] |