AEI Winddown, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10500 |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 13, 2022 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 19, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Aquion Energy, Inc.
32 39th St
Pittsburgh, PA 15201-3205 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | Aquion Energy emerges from Chapter 11 Bankruptcy under new owner (greentechmedia.com) |
Submitted Wed 07/26/2017 | |
2. | Battery maker Aquion Energy files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (powersource.post-gazette.com) |
Submitted Thu 03/09/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago |
Thursday, October 13, 2022 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 10/13 11:41 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM) |