|
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 08/11 10:43 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ads)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal
Sun 07/23 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Notice Date 07/22/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
order
Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal
Thu 07/20 4:16 PM
Ordered, that this case commenced under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code is dismissed pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b) and that the Debtor pay to the United States Trustee the appropriate sum required, if any, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1930, within ten (10) days of the entry of this order and simultaneously provide to the United States Trustee an appropriate affidavit indicating the cash disbursements, if any, for the relevant period. Notice of Dismissal Related [+]. Signed on 7/20/2017 (fmr)
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Tue 04/11 10:24 AM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearances: Rachel Weinberger from the Office of the United States Trustee, Alan Troyetsky Representing Landlord - Granted; Submit Order (tleonard)
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned BK)
Tue 04/11 10:25 AM
Hearing Held; Related [+] - Appearances: Rachel Weinberger from the Office of the United States Trustee, Alan Troyetsky Representing Landlord - Marked Off, It is So Ordered, By The Honorable Carla E. Craig. Endorsed on 4/5/17 calendar. (This is a text Order, no document attached) (tleonard)
|
11
|
|
11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order
Mon 03/13 1:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 03/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing Ch. 11
Sun 03/12 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing - Chapter 11 Non-Individual Notice Date 03/11/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sun 03/12 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/11/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing
Sun 03/12 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Notice Date 03/11/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Sat 03/11 5:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 03/10/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
order
Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges
Fri 03/10 4:14 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 3/10/2017 Status hearing to be held on 4/5/2017 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (tml)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thu 03/09 1:55 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/13/2017 at 01:00 PM at Room 2579, 271-C Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY. (mem)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
court
Notice of Hearing of Defective or Deficient Filing of Non-Individual Chapter 11 Case
Thu 03/09 10:47 AM
Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel. Hearing scheduled for 4/5/2017 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. Chapter 11 Non-Individual Attorney Cure due by 3/23/2017. (mem)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Wed 03/08 9:25 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11: Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 3/8/2017.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 3/8/2017. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 3/8/2017. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 3/8/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 3/8/2017. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 3/8/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 3/22/2017. Schedule A/B due 3/22/2017. Schedule D due 3/22/2017. Schedule E/F due 3/22/2017. Schedule G due 3/22/2017. Schedule H due 3/22/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 3/22/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/22/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 3/22/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 3/22/2017. (mem)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 03/08 9:16 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1717 Filed by Stronghold Warehouse, Inc. Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/6/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 7/6/2017. (mem)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Wed 03/08 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1717.00. Receipt Number 315961. (MM) (admin)
Related: [-]
|