Sharon Road Properties, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-30132
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-30132
North Carolina Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | J Craig Whitley |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-30363 |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 25, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Aug 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2021 |
Debtor
Sharon Road Partners, LLC
3545 Sharon Rd
Charlotte, NC 28211-3323 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sharon Road Properties, LLC
3545 Sharon Rd
Charlotte, NC 28211-3323 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Interested Party
U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission, U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Atlanta Regional Office 950 East Paces Ferry Road, NE Suite 900
Atlanta, GA 30326 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States Of America
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Michael Aldridge
5522 Medlin Road
Monroe, NC 28112 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Nathan Corey
247 Old 265 Lane
Mount Groghan, SC 29727 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Brian Corey
4224 Richland Court
Monroe, NC 28110 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Joseph W. Grier, III
Grier and Furr, P.A. 101 N. Tryon Street Suite 1240
Charlotte, NC 28202 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
402 W. Trade Street Suite 200
Charlotte, NC 28202 |
Docket last updated: 09/25/2017 10:57 AM EDT |
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Thu 03/09 10:48 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Involuntary Petition 17-30363 [misc,invPet] ( 335.00). Receipt number 7585878, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
5
pgs
misc
Involuntary Petition (fee)
Thu 03/09 10:46 AM
Involuntary Petition Under Chapter 7 Filing Fee Amount $ 335 Filed by (Henderson, James) |