Islamic Center of Culpeper v. County Of Culpeper, Virginia
Virginia Western District Court | |
Judge: | Norman K Moon |
Referred: | Joel C Hoppe |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00019 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
1. | Islamic center files discrimination lawsuit against Culpeper County (nbc29.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/10/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 12/19/2023 11:59 PM EST |
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
49 | 49
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Tue 05/16 3:33 PM
ORDER granting48 Joint Motion to Dismiss; (finding as moot16 Motion to Consolidate Cases). This matter is Dismissed with prejudice, the Court incorporates the terms of the Parties' Settlement Agreement by reference, in this Dismissal Order, the Court shall retain jurisdiction over this action for the purpose of resolving any dispute between the Parties with respect to the terms of, or enforcement of, the Parties' Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 5/16/17. (hnw) |
|
Att: 1 Settlement Agreement | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
48 | 48
motion
Dismiss
Mon 05/15 7:42 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Islamic Center of Culpeper.(DeRise, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Dismissal Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Executed Settlement Agreement | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 05/12 5:41 PM
ORDER granting46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, County Of Culpeper, Virginia answer due 5/25/2017.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 5/12/17. (hnw) |
|
46 | 46
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 05/12 3:47 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by County Of Culpeper, Virginia.Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe.(Alexis, Bobbi) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 05/05 4:36 PM
ORDER granting44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, County Of Culpeper, Virginia answer due 5/12/2017.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 5/5/17. (hnw) |
|
44 | 44
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 05/05 2:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by County Of Culpeper, Virginia.Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe.(Alexis, Bobbi) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 04/26 3:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Status Conference Call held in chambers on 4/26/2017. (kld) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 04/21 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Status Conference Call set for 4/26/2017 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to set up call and email parties dial in instructions. (kld) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
minutes
In Chambers Conference
Wed 04/19 3:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: In Chambers Conference Call with defense counsel held on 4/19/2017. (kld) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
minutes
In Chambers Conference
Mon 04/17 12:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: In Chambers Conference Call held with defense counsel on 4/17/2017. (kld) |
|
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 04/17 9:07 AM
NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) In Chambers Conference Call with Ms. Alexis and Mr. Connolly set for 4/17/2017 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to set up call and email Ms. Alexis & Mr. Connolly dial in instructions. (kld) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 04/07 8:48 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Settlement Conference held on 4/6/2017. (kld) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
In Chambers Conference
Wed 04/05 1:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: In Chambers Conference Call with defense counsel held on 4/5/2017. (kld) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
minutes
In Chambers Conference
Wed 04/05 1:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: In Chambers Conference Call with plaintiff's counsel held on 4/4/2017. (kld) |
|
35 | 35
minutes
In Chambers Conference
Wed 04/05 12:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: In Chambers Conference Call with defense counsel held on 4/4/2017. (kld) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 03/31 10:58 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery . filed by Islamic Center of Culpeper. (DeRise, Robert) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 03/31 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: (N) In Chambers Conference Call with DEFENSE COUNSEL ONLY set for 4/4/2017 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Call in information given to counsel.(kld) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 03/31 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: (N) In Chambers Conference Call with DEFENSE COUNSEL ONLY set for 4/5/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information given to counsel.(kld) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 03/31 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: (N) In Chambers Conference Call with PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ONLY set for 4/4/2017 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to set up call and email parties dial in information.(kld) |
|
30 | 30
minutes
In Chambers Conference
Fri 03/31 10:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: In Chambers Conference Call held on 3/31/2017. (kld) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
Mon 03/27 5:51 PM
Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery . filed by County Of Culpeper, Virginia.(Alexis, Bobbi) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order County's proposed Order to Consolidate | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 03/24 8:16 AM
NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) In Chambers Conference Call re: settlement conference set for 3/31/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to set up call and email parties dial in instructions. (kld) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Pretrial Order ~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/22 4:26 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER, CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe.. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/22/17. (hnw) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order Setting Settlement Conference
Wed 03/22 3:29 PM
Order Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 4/6/2017 12:30 PM in Harrisonburg before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 3/22/17. (kld) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/22 3:22 PM
ORAL ORDER granting14 MOTION for Sina Mansouri to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sina Mansouri for Islamic Center of Culpeper added. Entered by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/22/17. (hnw) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/22 3:21 PM
ORAL ORDER granting13 MOTION for Murad Hussain to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Murad Hussain for Islamic Center of Culpeper added. Entered by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/22/17. (hnw) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/22 3:19 PM
ORAL ORDER granting12 MOTION for Elliott C. Mogul to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Elliott C. Mogul for Islamic Center of Culpeper added. Entered by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/22/17. (hnw) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/22 3:18 PM
ORAL ORDER granting11 MOTION for Madihha Ahussain to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Madihha Ahussain for Islamic Center of Culpeper added. Entered by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/22/17. (hnw) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/22 3:17 PM
ORAL ORDER granting10 MOTION for James Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney James W. Cooper for Islamic Center of Culpeper added. Entered by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/22/17. (hnw) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation
Wed 03/22 3:06 PM
Order Referring Case for Mediation to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/22/17. (hnw) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order Referring Motion
Tue 03/21 1:34 PM
ORAL ORDER REFERRING MOTION:16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery filed by Islamic Center of Culpeper Motions referred to Joel C. Hoppe.. Entered by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/21/17. (hnw) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/20 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Lafay Connolly on behalf of County Of Culpeper, Virginia (Connolly, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/20 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon E. Pandak on behalf of County Of Culpeper, Virginia (Pandak, Sharon) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Consolidate Cases
Fri 03/17 7:57 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Discovery by Islamic Center of Culpeper.(DeRise, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Amended Scheduling Order (Case No. 16-cv-83), | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/17 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bobbi Jo Alexis on behalf of County Of Culpeper, Virginia (Alexis, Bobbi) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 7:35 PM
MOTION for Sina Mansouri to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Islamic Center of Culpeper.(DeRise, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 6:57 PM
MOTION for Murad Hussain to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Islamic Center of Culpeper.(DeRise, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 6:37 PM
MOTION for Elliott C. Mogul to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Islamic Center of Culpeper.(DeRise, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 6:13 PM
MOTION for Madihha Ahussain to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Islamic Center of Culpeper.(DeRise, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 5:51 PM
MOTION for James W. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Islamic Center of Culpeper.(DeRise, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 11:15 AM
ORAL ORDER granting6 MOTION for Johnathan J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Johnathan J. Smith for Islamic Center of Culpeper added. Entered by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/16/17. (hnw) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 11:14 AM
ORAL ORDER granting5 MOTION for David P. Gersch to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney David P. Gersch for Islamic Center of Culpeper added. Entered by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/16/17. (hnw) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 03/16 10:38 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Islamic Center of Culpeper. County Of Culpeper, Virginia waiver sent on 3/15/2017, answer due 5/15/2017.(DeRise, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/14 11:51 PM
MOTION for Johnathan J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Islamic Center of Culpeper.(DeRise, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/14 11:43 PM
MOTION for David P. Gersch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Islamic Center of Culpeper.(DeRise, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/14 2:28 PM
NOTICE by Islamic Center of Culpeper of Intent to Participate in March 15, 2017 Scheduling Conference in 3:16-cv-00083 (DeRise, Robert) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/09 11:09 AM
Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Islamic Center of Culpeper (hnw) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 03/09 11:08 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to County Of Culpeper, Virginia NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (hnw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/09 11:05 AM
COMPLAINT against County Of Culpeper, Virginia (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00 paid by e-receipt no. 0423-2632822), filed by Islamic Center of Culpeper. 70 Day Notice due by 5/18/2017 90 Day Service due by 6/7/2017(hnw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |