Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:17-cv-00691
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2017
Last checked: Friday Mar 10, 2017 2:47 AM CST
Defendant
Advocare International LP
Defendant
Wes Bewley
Defendant
Tyler Deberry
Defendant
Jenny Donnelly
Defendant
Dawn Funk
Defendant
Daniel McDaniel
Defendant
Crystal Thurber
Plaintiff
Megan Cornelius
Represented By
Randall Adam Swick
Reid Collins & Tsai LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Ranieri
Represented By
Randall Adam Swick
Reid Collins & Tsai LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, March 20, 2017
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 1:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Crystal Thurber. Waiver sent on 3/15/2017. (Swick, Randall)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 1:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Daniel McDaniel. Waiver sent on 3/15/2017. (Swick, Randall)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 1:36 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dawn Funk. Waiver sent on 3/15/2017. (Swick, Randall)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 1:34 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jenny Donnelly. Waiver sent on 3/15/2017. (Swick, Randall)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 1:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tyler Deberry. Waiver sent on 3/15/2017. (Swick, Randall)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 1:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Wes Bewley. Waiver sent on 3/15/2017. (Swick, Randall)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2017
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Advocare International LP. Waiver sent on 3/15/2017. (Swick, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2017
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 9:27 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (twd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
4 4 qcref Boyle Fri 9:16 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (twd)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 5:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Megan Cornelius, Lisa Ranieri. (Swick, Randall)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Affidavit Thu 5:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT re1 Complaint,,,, Appendix of Documents Cited in Class Action Complaint by Megan Cornelius, Lisa Ranieri. (Swick, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Megan Cornelius, Lisa Ranieri. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8266572) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Swick, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet