6
|
|
6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 04/08 3:34 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE The filing of the judgment dated April 8, 2020 in any case that was previously dismissed is a function of the courts automated systems and is not intended to have any effect on such prior dismissal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/08 2:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OFDEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/8/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 11/08 7:25 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Summons & Complaint served on Pfizer Inc. on 3/6/2017, filed by Marvin G. Turnbough II. (Baden, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 6:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Pfizer Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 03/09 10:07 AM
Case assigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/09 7:25 AM
COMPLAINT against Pfizer Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11217423.). Filed byMarvin G Turnbough II.(Baden, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
Summons Summons-Pfizer Inc.
|