WCX LLC
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jeff Bohm |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-31556 |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Debtor
WCX LLC
25442 China Spgs
Spring, TX 77373-8279 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Rodney D Tow
Rodney Tow, PLLC 1122 Highborne Cay Court
Texas City, TX 77590 |
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 03/10/2017 12:03 PM CST |
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 03/10 9:18 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-31556 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18806509. Fee amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) [system event]
Fri 03/10 9:17 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by WCX LLC. (Payne, Kyle) |