Clowers et al v. OneMain Financial, Inc.
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | E Scott Frost |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00033 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2017 4:38 AM CDT |
Defendant
OneMain Financial, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lola Clowers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oliver Clowers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Tue 01/02 10:07 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Based upon12 Stipulation of Dismissal, the Court dismisses this action with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The parties will each bear their own costs, fees, and expenses. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 1/2/2018) (jmc) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Thu 12/28 10:17 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Oliver Clowers. (Hall, Lance) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Fri 11/17 1:28 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by OneMain Financial, Inc.. (Durham, Matthew) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
trial
Designation of Experts
Fri 08/25 4:16 PM
Designation of Experts by Lola Clowers, Oliver Clowers. (Hall, Lance) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/01 11:11 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:. Amended Pleadings due by 8/4/2017. Discovery due by 11/3/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 7/7/2017. Motions due by 12/29/2017. Status Report due by 11/17/2017. See Order for further deadlines. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 5/1/2017) (jak) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order
Wed 04/26 11:57 AM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by OneMain Financial, Inc.. (Durham, Matthew) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Mon 03/27 4:47 PM
Order Requiring Attorney Conference and Proposal for Contents of Scheduling and Discovery Order: The Parties Joint Proposal is due by 4/26/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 3/27/2017) (mmg) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/24 8:19 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by OneMain Financial, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Durham, Matthew) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 03/20 10:15 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Original Petition (attached as exhibit to Doc. 1). The Court hereby extends the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition to March 24, 2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 3/20/2017) (jak) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 03/17 11:11 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to file response to Plaintiff's Original Petition filed by OneMain Financial, Inc. (Durham, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Fri 03/10 4:27 PM
Order and Notice of Option To Consent To Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 3/10/2017) (jak) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/10 3:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OneMain Financial, Inc.. (Durham, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/10 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd District Court of Nolan County, case number 19768 filed by OneMain Financial, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8269199) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Durham, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 6 | ||
qcref
Frost Mag Presider (Abilene)
Fri 03/10 4:24 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (jak) |