Connelly v. Johnson & Johnson Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00694 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2017 4:28 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Connelly
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Tue 03/30 11:36 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal. (chmb) |
||
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Wed 03/24 1:37 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Patricia Connelly. (Fulmer, Brenda) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/10 9:06 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Patricia Connelly. (Fulmer, Brenda) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/10 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Related Case filed by Patricia Connelly (Fulmer, Brenda) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/10 8:37 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson Inc filed by Patricia Connelly. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8266881) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Fulmer, Brenda) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |