Fleischner et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00703 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 27, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2017 3:54 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Fleischner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Wallerstein
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Wed 03/15 2:15 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Products Inc. (Bruksch, Terri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Schedule A | ||
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Fri 05/27 9:44 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE - The Court has been notified by the Special Master-James Stanton that defense counsel has confirmed to him that a signed settlement agreement has be executed in this case. The Parties are therefore directed to submit their dismissal papers as soon as the settlement is fully consummated. There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and should further proceedings become necessary or desirable, any party or the Court may initiate such further proceedings in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/27/2022) (chmb) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/10 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Related Case filed by David Fleischner, Diana Wallerstein (Rheingold, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/10 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against DePuy Orthopaedics Inc filed by David Fleischner, Diana Wallerstein. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8267733) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Rheingold, David) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Interested Persons, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |