|
GPO
Aug 07 2017
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Motion re: The Court should deny Lowe's motion for default judgment as to Defendant Texas State Legislature [Dkt. Nos. 37 & 39]. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/7/2017) (ykp)
|
|
GPO
Aug 24 2017
ORDER ACCEPTING 40 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment as to defendant Texas State Legislature (docket entries 37 & 39) is therefore DENIED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/24/2017) (ykp)
|
|
GPO
Sep 29 2017
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Motion re: 53 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Sherri R Lowe. The Court should deny Plaintiff Sherri R. Lowe's 9/26/2017 53 MOTION for Default Judgment. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/29/2017) (epm)
|
|
GPO
Oct 06 2017
ORDER ACCEPTING 52 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff's motion for default judgment as to defendant Dallas Police Department and as to the various John Doe defendants (docket entry 48) is therefore DENIED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/6/2017) (axm) Modified linkage on 10/6/2017 (axm).
|
|
GPO
Oct 20 2017
Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/20/2017) (epm) Order Accepting 54 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: 53 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Sherri R Lowe. The court therefore DENIES plaintiff Sherri R. Lowe's 9/26/2017 53 Motion for Default Judgment. (Ordered by Senior
|
|
GPO
Oct 20 2017
Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/20/2017) (epm) Order Accepting 54 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: 53 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Sherri R Lowe. The court therefore DENIES plaintiff Sherri R. Lowe's 9/26/2017 53 Motion for Default Judgment. (Ordered by Senior
|
|
GPO
Oct 26 2017
ORDER ACCEPTING 57 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/26/2017) (axm)
|
|
GPO
Mar 21 2018
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Case re: 3 Complaint filed by Sherri R Lowe. The Court should dismiss the remaining claims in this action without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/21/2018) (epm)
|
|
GPO
Apr 11 2018
ORDER ACCEPTING 64 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/11/2018) (sss) Modified linkage on 4/13/2018 (sss).
|