Kutoloski v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00706 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 10, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2017 4:38 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Synthes Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 20, Inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson International
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas P Schmalzried, MD
|
|
Plaintiff
Joan Kutoloski
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Thu 03/10 2:26 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson and Johnson International, Johnson and Johnson Services Inc, Thomas P Schmalzried, MD. (Bruksch, Terri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Case List | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Thu 03/10 2:33 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal. (chmb) |
||
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Thu 05/03 4:03 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is Attorney David Markevitch's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record, filed in 3:12-cv-0106-K; Young, et al., v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al., and other cases (Doc. No. 29), on May 1, 2018. The motion reflects that Mr. Markevitch is no longer employed by Kaiser Gornick, LLP, and to save resources, the Court takes judicial notice of that motion, and enters this order in the remaining cases where he is counsel of record in the DePuy MDL-2244 cases with the law firm Kaiser Gornick, LLP. Therefore, David Markevitch is hereby Withdrawn as Counsel for Plaintiffs, and Lawrence J. Gornick shall remain as Counsel for Plaintiffs in these various cases. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/3/2018) (chmb) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
utility
Electronic Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 03/10 2:17 PM
Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:17-cv-01146. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14 Conditional Transfer Order - 262 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2244, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Texas and assigned to Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade. Case transferred electronically on 3/8/2017. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge George H. Wu: The Court CONTINUES the Status Conference previously set for 03/06/2017 to 04/17/17 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Stay Case,11 . Case stayed. All proceedings in this action are hereby stayed, pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on whether this case should be transferred to In re DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, MDL Docket No. 2244. (Status Conference set for 3/6/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
Monday, February 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson International, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc..(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings | ||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
9 | 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu; This action has been reassigned to the Honorable George H. Wu, U.S. District Judge and the Honorable Jacqueline Chooljian, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court sets a Status Conference for March 6, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:11-cv-02441 GW(JCx). Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-01146 GW(JCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson International, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc., of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on February 14, 2017.(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment to Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. Transferred to Judge Wu(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Related Cases Part 1 of 7, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Related Cases Part 2 of 7, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Related Cases Part 3 of 7, | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Related Cases Part 4 of 7, | ||
Att: 5 Notice of Related Cases Part 5 of 7, | ||
Att: 6 Notice of Related Cases Part 6 of 7, | ||
Att: 7 Notice of Related Cases Part 7 of 7 | ||
3 | 3 Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendants DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., (Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc..(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC646226 Receipt No: 0973-19355684 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson & Johnson International, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc., DePuy International Limited, Johnson & Johnson. (Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party DePuy International Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party DePuy Orthopaedics Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party DePuy Synthes, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson International(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action | ||
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson International, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc., Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D., a Professional Corporation. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Joan Kutoloski. Filed in State Court on 1/9/17. Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/10/2017.] |