Adams v. Rushing et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Gren Scholer |
Referred: | Irma Carrillo Ramirez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00716 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2017 4:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
Steven Gorwood
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sammy Moon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charlene Rushing
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of Balch Springs Texas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Adams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
56 | 56
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 06/04 12:48 PM
ORDER granting55 Mot ion to Dismiss filed by Wanda Adams. All claims asserted or that could have been asserted pursuant to the incident forming the basis of the above-styled and numbered cause, are hereby dismissed with prejudice to the refiling of the same, with costs to be paid by the party incurring the same. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/4/2018) (ndt) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
55 | 55
motion
Dismiss
Thu 05/31 5:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Wanda Adams (Cox, Clayton) |