In re: Seizure Warrant Executed on Veritex Community Bank on September 29, 2016 on Accounts: XXXX2123; XXXX2112; XXXX2387; and XXXX2398
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Referred: | Irma Carrillo Ramirez |
Case #: | 3:17-mc-00017 |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago |
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 04/10 9:03 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss. This action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/10/2017) (epm) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Thu 04/06 4:57 PM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Motion for Return of Property Seized by the Government filed by Linda Hodges (Jackson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Thu 04/06 9:22 AM
ORDER re: the1 Motion for Return of Property Seized by the Government. The movant may file a reply to the government's response by 4/12/2017. Oral argument set for 4/14/2017 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/6/2017) (mcrd) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/31 4:22 PM
ORDER: The government filed its response to the Motion for Return of Property Seized by the Government. The motion for issuance of summonses in3 movant's Notice of Service and Motion for Issuance of Summonses is therefore denied as moot. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/31/2017) (ash) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 03/30 9:54 AM
RESPONSE filed by United States re:1 Miscellaneous Case Initiating Documents, (Cruz-Zapata-DOJ, Diana) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Letter | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/17 12:55 PM
Notice of Service and Motion for Issuance of Summonses filed by Linda Hodges (Jackson, Robert) Modified on 3/17/2017 to update event to Motion (svc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B-1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) C-1, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) D, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) E, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) F, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) G, | ||
Att: 11 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/15 3:32 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b),1 Motion for Return of Property Seized by the Government, filed 3/10/2017, is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for hearing, if necessary, and determination. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/15/2017) (sss) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/14 10:02 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Sam A Lindsay. Judge Reed C. O'Connor no longer assigned to the case. (cea) |
||
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Miscellaneous Case Initiating Documents
Fri 03/10 3:18 PM
Motion For Return of Property Seized by the Government filed by Linda Hodges. (Filing fee $47; Receipt number 0539-8268746) (Jackson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F, | ||
Att: 7 Cover Sheet | ||
qcref
O' Connor (DALLAS CASES)
Fri 03/10 3:58 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case preliminarily assigned to Judge Ramirez for items that may be referred. (twd) |