Niazi, Imran v. St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc.
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | James D Peterson |
Referred: | Stephen L Crocker |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00183 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:145 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2017 3:56 AM CDT |
Defendant
St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Imran Niazi
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action
Tue 11/07 10:14 AM
Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls) |
|
Att: 1 Order, | ||
Att: 2 Judgment | ||
37 | 37
order
Judgment
Tue 11/07 10:13 AM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. dismissing the case. (jls) |
|
36 | 36
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Tue 11/07 10:09 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot24 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and denying as moot26 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/7/2017. (jls) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Tue 10/31 3:14 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** It is ORDERED that the parties' joint motion for entry of a stipulated protective order is GRANTED and the parties' proposed draft is ENTERED as the court's order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/31/2017. (jls) |
|
34 | 34
motion
Protective Order
Tue 10/31 2:41 PM
Joint Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Imran Niazi. (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order : Protective Order | ||
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Brief in Reply
Thu 10/26 5:54 PM
Brief in Reply by Defendant St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. in Support of24 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Shah, Kalpesh) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Wed 10/25 11:18 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** On October 24, 2017, plaintiff filed a motion to compel discovery (dkt.30 ) to which it attached a copy of defendant's responses in which defendant's counsel refused to provide any information whatsoever because "plaintiff submitting this discovery does not have standing.. to bring this action, and therefore is not entitled to serve discovery." Counsel indicates that it will revisit its response if necessary after obtaining rulings on its pending motions to dismiss. See dkt.31 . Discovery in this case began on August 17, 2017, following the preliminary pretrial conference and it has not been stayed by the court. Defendant did not ask for a stay of discovery in either of its pending motions to dismiss. As a starting point, the court cannot discern what defendant actually gains by baldly refusing to participate in discovery. Even if both of defendant's pending motions were to be granted, these rulings would not dispose of this lawsuit on its merits: this case would simply continue in a different court with a different plaintiff that is inextricably intertwined with the current plaintiff (who has a motion to substitute parties pending), and defendant still would have to provide the requested discovery. More saliently, at this juncture in this case in this court, defendant has improperly arrogated to itself this court's case management prerogatives and in the process defendant has violated this court's preliminary pretrial conference order (dkt.21 ) and F.R. Civ. Pro. 1. Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery is GRANTED without the need for a response. It is ORDERED that forthwith--meaning as soon as possible, and not later than noon on November 1, 2017-- defendant shall provide full responses to all of plaintiff's pending discovery demands or face sanctions under F.R. Civ. Pro. 37(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/25/2017. (jls) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Declaration
Tue 10/24 11:30 AM
Declaration of Michael T. Griggs filed by Plaintiff Imran Niazi re:30 Motion to Compel (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Niazi's 1st Set of discovery to St. Jude, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Shah's Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Email Chain, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Answers to Interrogatories, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Responses to RFP's | ||
30 | 30
motion
Compel
Tue 10/24 11:20 AM
Motion to Compel St. Jude to Respond to Niazi's First Set of Discovery Requests by Plaintiff Imran Niazi. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 10/31/2017. (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Brief in Opposition
Mon 10/16 11:07 AM
Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Imran Niazi re:24 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Brief in Opposition
Wed 10/11 4:58 PM
Brief in Opposition by Defendant St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. re:26 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Imran Niazi (Shah, Kalpesh) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Declaration
Wed 10/04 1:52 PM
Declaration of Michael T. Griggs filed by Plaintiff Imran Niazi re:26 Motion to Substitute Party (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Assignment | ||
26 | 26
motion
Substitute Party
Wed 10/04 1:49 PM
Motion to Substitute Party by Plaintiff Imran Niazi. Response due 10/11/2017. (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Brief in Support
Mon 09/25 5:23 PM
Brief in Support of24 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. (Shah, Kalpesh) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 09/25 5:20 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 10/16/2017. Brief in Reply due 10/26/2017. (Shah, Kalpesh) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Declaration (not related to a motion)
Fri 09/22 10:12 AM
Declaration of Imran Niazi re22 Proof of Standing to Sue on Claimed Patents (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - The '268 Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration for application for the '268 patent | ||
22 | 22
misc
Proof of Standing to Sue on Claimed Patents
Fri 09/22 10:06 AM
Proof of Standing to Sue on Claimed Patents by Plaintiff Imran Niazi (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Patent Assignment | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Pretrial Conference Order
Mon 08/21 9:59 AM
Pretrial Conference Order - Proof of Standing to sue on claimed patents due 9/22/2017. Preliminary Disclosure of Infringement Contentions due 11/17/2017. Defendant's Response due 12/15/2017. Preliminary Disclosure of Invalidity and Unenforceability Contentions due 1/26/2018. Plaintiff's response due 2/23/2018. Amendments to Pleadings due 10/20/2017. Dispositive Motions due 7/13/2018. Settlement Letters due 12/7/2018. Motions in Limine due 12/7/2018. Response to Motion due 12/21/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 1/28/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/18/2017. (jls) |
|
20 | 20
order
Standing Order on Discovery of Electronically Stored Information
Mon 08/21 9:52 AM
Standing Order Relating to the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information in a Complex Civil Lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/18/2017. (jls) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report
Mon 08/14 1:39 PM
Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Imran Niazi (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Brief in Reply
Mon 07/31 10:33 AM
Brief in Reply by Defendant St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. in Support of13 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, (Shah, Kalpesh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Online News Article | ||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Pretrial or Status Conference
Thu 07/20 2:21 PM
Set Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2017 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] (jls) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Declaration (not related to a motion)
Wed 07/19 2:01 PM
Declaration of Michael T. Griggs re16 Brief in Opposition to Dismiss for Improper Venue (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Territory Rep ASJM- Madison Job Posting, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Regional Sales Manager Job Description, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Med Device Sales Specialist Job Description, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Direct Service Manager Job Description, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Direct Sales Rep Job Description | ||
16 | 16
respm
Brief in Opposition
Wed 07/19 1:45 PM
Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Imran Niazi re:13 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Affidavit
Fri 06/30 6:57 AM
Affidavit of Theresa Tischer filed by Defendant St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. re:13 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (lak) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Brief in Support
Thu 06/29 8:50 AM
Brief in Support of13 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by Defendant St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. (Shah, Kalpesh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, T. Tischer Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 06/28 5:14 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 7/19/2017. Brief in Reply due 7/31/2017. (Shah, Kalpesh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, T. Tischer Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 06/14 9:15 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs, (Griggs, Michael) Modified on 6/14/2017: Added exhibit description. E-mail to counsel. Disregard future entries. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Patent No.: 6,638,268 | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Amend Complaint
Wed 05/31 1:18 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties' joint motion, Dkt.10 , is granted in part. Plaintiff may have until June 14, 2017, to file an amended complaint identifying the "correct" defendants. At that time, by virtue of the amendment, the current defendants will be dismissed from the case. Defendants' deadline to answer is extended to June 15, 2017. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/31/2017. (voc) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 05/31 1:21 PM
Reset Answer Deadlines: Abbott Laboratories answer due 6/15/2017; St. Jude Medical, Inc. answer due 6/15/2017. (voc) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Amend Complaint
Fri 05/26 6:07 PM
Joint Motion to Amend1 Complaint, by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 6/2/2017. Brief in Reply due 6/9/2017. (Shah, Kalpesh) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 05/02 3:24 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendants have shown good cause for their request for another extension of their deadline to answer, so the request is granted. Defendants should not expect another extension of this deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/2/2017. (jls) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 05/02 12:56 PM
Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Shah, Kalpesh) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/05 2:57 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Abbott Laboratories answer due 5/5/2017; St. Jude Medical, Inc. answer due 5/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/5/2017. (jls) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 04/05 2:26 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Shah, Kalpesh) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 03/24 10:23 AM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Abbott Laboratories served on 3/15/2017, answer due 4/5/2017. (Griggs, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 03/24 10:20 AM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. St. Jude Medical, Inc. served on 3/16/2017, answer due 4/6/2017. (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action
Fri 03/10 4:05 PM
Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/10 4:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories and St. Jude Medical, Inc. (jls) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Patent or Trademark
Fri 03/10 9:52 AM
PATENT COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-1986602.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 6,638,268, issued 10/28/03, held by Imran K. Niazi, filed by Imran Niazi, (Griggs, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - The '268 Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Summons St. Jude, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Abbott, | ||
Att: 4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action | ||
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Fri 03/10 3:56 PM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related Case Nos. 17-cv-184 and 17-cv-185. (jls) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Fri 03/10 3:56 PM
Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (jls) |