Santich v. VCG Holding Corp. et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Michael E Hegarty |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00631 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jun 25, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 08, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2017 3:05 AM MDT |
Defendant
Denver Restaurant Concepts LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Troy Lowrie
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kenkev II, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Indy Restaurant Concepts, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Glendale Restaurant Concepts LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Glenarm Restaurant LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Ocello
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stout Restaurant Concepts, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VCG Restaurants Denver, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lowrie Management, LLLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VCG Holding Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexis Nagle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Wozneak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Mansfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chada Mantooth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karla Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christina Massaro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Penny Watkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laportia Oakley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gale Raffaele
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Rail
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Saulters-Archuleta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Shafer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Casandra Windecker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amrica Terrell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melanie Tracy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Talita Catto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Georgina Santich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Abbott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janel Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrianne Axelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emily Bachelder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alena Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Berry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Bujok
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandi Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Livingston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Chavez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ariel Cline
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Megan Fitzgerald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Gabriel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Glines
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Porscha Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johanna Grissom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Hale
|
Represented By
|
1. | 500 female strippers file lawsuit against strip club company alleging exploitation of workers (fortune.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/15/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago |
Monday, November 08, 2021 | ||
256 | 256
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/08 8:55 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 November 2021. Before the Court is the parties' Stipulation to Dismiss Action with Prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)255 . Here, all parties have signed the Stipulation. Therefore, this case was DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, upon the filing of the Stipulation. No order of dismissal is necessary. (cmadr, ) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Mon 11/08 8:58 AM
Civil Case Terminated on 8 November 2021. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) |
||
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
255 | 255
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal of Case
Thu 11/04 10:10 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice by Plaintiffs Andrea Abbott, Janel Anderson, Adrianne Axelson, Emily Bachelder, Alena Bailey, Rachel Berry, Nicole Bujok, Brandi Campbell, Talita Catto, Melissa Chavez, Ariel Cline, Megan Fitzgerald, Amanda Gabriel, Amy Glines, Porscha Green, Johanna Grissom, Kimberly Hale, Amanda Livingston, Amanda Mansfield, Chada Mantooth, Karla Martinez, Christina Massaro, Alexis Nagle, Laportia Oakley, Gale Raffaele, Rebecca Rail, Georgina Santich, Jessica Saulters-Archuleta, Amanda Shafer, Amrica Terrell, Melanie Tracy, Penny Watkins, Casandra Windecker, Ashley Wozneak. (Newman, Mari) |