D'Alessandro Landscape, Inc.
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Paul G Hyman, Jr |
Case #: | 9:17-bk-12922 |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Apr 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2017 |
Debtor
D'Allessandro Landscape, Inc.
1524 Summer Ave
Jupiter, FL 33469-3120 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Margaret J. Smith
1400 Centrepark Blvd., Suite 860
West Palm Beach, FL 33401 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 03/11/2017 12:01 PM EST |
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 03/10 2:50 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-12922 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29409751. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]
Fri 03/10 2:47 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $335] (Newburgh, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset)
Fri 03/10 2:47 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 04/17/2017 at 01:30 PM at 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 870, West Palm Beach. Proofs of Claim due by 07/17/2017. (Newburgh, Steven) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Fri 03/10 2:48 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor D'Allessandro Landscape, Inc.. (Newburgh, Steven) |