Chacon v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Brian C Wimes |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00176 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 07, 2017 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
100 North Tryon St.
Charlotte, NC 28202 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
221 Bolivar Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hector L Chacon
9912 E. 84th St.
Raytown, MO 64138 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/23 10:18 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal WITH BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ONLY by Hector L Chacon. (Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
utility
Remark
Tue 06/27 10:01 AM
***Remark: The Court hereby acknowledges the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice with regard to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Consistent with the parties' notice of settlement (Doc. #11) and subsequent Order of Dismissal (Doc. #21), Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED. (Baldwin, Joella) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 06/20 1:45 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal WITH PREJUDICE AS TO EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC ONLY by Hector L Chacon. (Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 06/12 11:52 AM
Order of Dismissal. Signed on 6/12/17 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 06/07 12:36 PM
NOTICE of settlement WITH BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ONLY by Hector L Chacon (Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
19 | 19
order
Rule 16 Notice ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 06/07 9:40 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/13/2017. Rule 26 conference due by 6/29/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 6/7/17 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order Transferring/Reassigning Case
Wed 06/07 9:00 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. District Judge Beth Phillips no longer assigned to case. New Case No.: 4:17-cv-00176-BCW. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Burch, C. Steve) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Letter of reassignment
Tue 06/06 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays to District Judge Beth Phillips. Please note the new case number: 17-176-CV-W-BP. (Melvin, Greg) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Transferring/Reassigning Case
Mon 06/05 11:19 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays for all further proceedings. District Judge Dean Whipple no longer assigned to case. New Case No.: 4:17-cv-00176-SWH. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Burch, C. Steve) |
|
notice
Notice of Magistrate Assignment
Mon 06/05 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT sent via email to all counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 6/26/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Burch, C. Steve) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/30 4:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, on behalf of Bank of America, N.A..(Walker, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 05/10 1:04 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Rule 16 Notice
Tue 05/09 4:09 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/10/2017. Signed on 05/09/2017 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 05/08 4:35 PM
ORDER - The Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc.12 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall file its answer or other response on or before May 30, 2017. Signed on 05/08/2017 by District Judge Dean Whipple. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 05/08 3:44 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Jennifer M. Walker on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/22/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Walker, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 04/26 12:08 PM
NOTICE of settlement WITH EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC ONLY by Hector L Chacon (Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 11:25 AM
NOTICE of appearance by James Dale Lawrence on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Attorney James Dale Lawrence added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft))(Lawrence, James) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 04/06 9:11 AM
ORDER - The Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc.8 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall file its answer or other response on or before May 7, 2017. Signed on 04/06/2017 by District Judge Dean Whipple. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 04/05 5:02 PM
Consent MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Complaint filed by Jennifer M. Walker on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/19/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Walker, Jennifer) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/05 4:55 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Jennifer M. Walker on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Attorney Jennifer M. Walker added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft))(Walker, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 03/30 4:25 PM
ORDER T- he Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc.5 ) is GRANTED. On or before May 8, 2017, Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed on 03/30/2017 by District Judge Dean Whipple. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 03/30 11:51 AM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer re1 Complaint, filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/13/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Guillermo G. Zorogastua added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Zorogastua, Guillermo) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Return of Service of Complaint Executed
Tue 03/21 3:07 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Hector L Chacon. Bank of America, N.A. served on 3/17/2017, answer due 4/7/2017.(Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Notice of MAP | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service of Complaint Executed
Tue 03/21 12:50 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Hector L Chacon. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/17/2017, answer due 4/7/2017.(Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Petition Notice of MAP | ||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of MAPN
Mon 03/13 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Ellis, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 10:18 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Ellis, Lindsey) |
||
Saturday, March 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 03/11 12:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Chelsea S. Herring Springer on behalf of Hector L Chacon. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-5209302. Service due by 6/9/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - H, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |