Gordmans Stores, Inc.
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-80304 |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Plan Confirmed: | Oct 18, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Gordmans Stores, Inc.
13917 Gold Circle, Suite 200
Omaha, NE 68144 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:24 PM CST |
Attorney
Baird Holm LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
McGrath North Mullin & Kratz
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AOI Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ARC CPOKCOK001, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
ARC QSOKCOK001, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
ARCP MT Lafayette IN, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ARCP MT Springfield IL, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
All-State Brokerage, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arapahoe Crossings, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Argo Partners
12 West 37th St 9th Fl.
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ash Investors, LLC
3346 South Pine Tree Road
Hobart, WI 54155 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bank Of the West
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tammy Bonfiglio
C/O Jared Wall
Bismarck, ND 58501 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bottling Group, LLC and its affiliates and subsidiaries, operating as Pepsi Beverages Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brixmor GA Westminster LLC
c/o General Counsel 450 Lexington Avenue, 13th Floor
New York, NY 10170 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brixmor Holdings 6 SPE, LLC
c/o General Counsel 450 Lexington Avenue, 13th Floor
New York, NY 10170 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brixmor Property Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Broadmoor Towne Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Burnsville Center SPE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CBL & Associates Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue, Suite 240
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
CSHV Crossroads, LLC fka WILCAL Crossroads, LLC
332 Minnesota Street #w118
St. Paul, MN 55101 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cabot IV-IN1B02, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Canam PO LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Catalyst Westowne, LLC,
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cedar Glade LP
|
|
Creditor
CenterCal Properties, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Champaign Marketplace L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cintas Corporation No. 2
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cole MT Albuquerque NM, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cole MT Rapid City SD (I), LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cole MT Riverdale UT, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Colosseum Athletics Corporation
Goosmann Law Firm, PLC 17838 Burke St., Ste. 250
Omaha, NE 68118 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Comenity Bank
Fraser Stryker PC LLO 409 South 17th Street 500 Energy Plaza
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Compliance Networks, LLC, n/k/a Traverse Systems, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Coronado Anchor Acquisition, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Countrywood LeaseCo, L.L.C.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DDR Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DSW Leased Business Division LLC dba Affiliated Business Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DSW, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Demandware, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Design Research Inc./Branded Custom Sportswear
Spencer Fane LLP 1000 Walnut Suite 1400
Kansas City, MO 64106 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Development, LLC
1307 Leavenworth St., Ste. B
Omaha, NE 68102 |
|
Creditor
EMC Risk Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
EPS
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Excel FT Union LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
Ansonia Finance Station PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023 |
|
Creditor
Fayette Plaza CMBS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fit For Life Llc
100 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
Forms Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
G&I VI St. Charles Retail LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
G&I VIII Lakeshore Marketplace LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GGP, Inc.
110 Wacker Drive.
Chicago, IL 60606 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Garrison Chapel Hills Owner, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Roger Glenn
812 S. 198th St.
Elkhorn, NE 68022 |
|
Creditor
Google Inc.
White and Williams LLP 1650 Market Street Suite 1800
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Google LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gordon Brothers Retail Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gravois Bluffs III, LLC
Carmody MacDonald P.C. 120 South Central Avenue Suite 1800
Saint Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rhonda M. Grieger
574318th St.
South Fargo, ND 58104 |
|
Creditor
Michael W. Hammond
PO Box 703
Somerset, CA 95684 |
|
Creditor
Hy-Vee, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
IRC Creekside Commons, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
IRC Princess City Plaza, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
IRC Riverdale Commons, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
IRC Rivertree Court, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ikeddi Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Inland Commercial Real Estate Services, LLC, as managing agent for Countrywood LeaseCo, L.L.C.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Business Machines Corporation (IBM)
|
|
Creditor
Isaac Imports, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Island City Point, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kidz Concepts, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kir E. Wichita L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
LB International Incorporated
90 Merrick Avenue
East Meadow, NY 11554 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
LaSalle Shopping Center, LLC, assignee of Hay Creek Development, LLC
11240 Davenport Street
Omaha, NE 68154 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lifeworks Technology Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Liquidity Solutions, Inc.
One University Plaza Suite 312
Hackensack, NJ 07601 |
|
Creditor
Lockard Development, Inc.
4501 Prairie Parkway
Cedar Falls, IA 50613 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
MB Sioux City Lakeport, L.L.C.
Chapman and Cutler, LLP 111 West Monroe St.
Chicago, IL 60603 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Macerich South Park Mall LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Meridian CenterCal, L.L.C.
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Meridian Mall Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
301 W. High Street Room 670
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Retail Properties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Retail Properties, LP
|
|
Creditor
National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Attn: Adam L. Rosen 489 Fifth Avenue, 21st Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
New Haven WG, LLC
Fraser Stryker PC LLO 500 Energy Plaza 409 South 17th Street
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ocean Drive Accessories, LLC d/b/a David Allen Accessories
Spencer Fane LLP 1000 Walnut, Suite 1400
Kansas City, MO 64106 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oklahoma County Treasurer
Tammy Jones 320 Robert S. Kerr, Room 307
Oklahoma City, OK 73102 |
|
Creditor
One Step Up, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St 17 Fl
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc., successor in interest to MICROS Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PC Connection Sales Corp. d/b/a Connection
730 Milford Road
Merrimack, NH 03054 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PTI Ft. Wayne, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Paramount Coffee Company
5133 W. Grand River
Lansing, MI 48906 |
|
Creditor
Parmatown Station, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pinnacle South, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Porter's Vale Shopping Center LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Portfolio Arts Group, Ltd.
129 Glover Avenue C/O Elana Bloom
Norwalk, CT 06801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Primeshares
261 Fifth Avenue 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
|
Creditor
Project 28 Clothing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Regency Centers
|
|
Creditor
Shackleford Crossings Investors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Simon Property Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Smith County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Southaven Towne Center II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Station Park CenterCal, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sun Gordmans LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
THF Chesterfield Three Development, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TKG Coral North LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TKG Lincoln Crossing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TN Dept. of Revenue
PO Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
TVM CenterCal, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
John Stern c/o Sherri K. Simpson, Paralegal P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The District L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Macerich Company
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Retail Connection
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thornton Town Center 05A, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tiger Capital Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Travel and Transport, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
U.S. Bank Nat'l Assoc., as Trustee for the Registered Holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Com. Mort. Securities Corp., Com. Mort. Pass-Through Cert., Series 2006-LDP7
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, c/o Matthew I. Kramer, Esq. 2601 S. Bayshore Dr., Ste. 1500
Miami, FL 33133 |
|
Creditor
U.S. Bank National Association d/b/a U.S. Bank Equipment Finance
1299 Farnam Street Suite 1500
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vantiv, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vertex, Inc.
PO Box 3001
Malvern, PA 19355 |
|
Creditor
Vestar Bowles Crossing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Village Park at Plover, LLC
Miller & Martin PLLC 832 Georgia Avenue, Suite 1200
Chattanooga, TN 37402 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Waitt Aksarben 8, LLC
Fraser Stryker PC LLO 500 Energy Plaza 409 South 17th Street
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Denise West, Shopping Center Manager Building Sales, National Accounts 2001 S.E. 10th Street
Bentonville, AR 72716 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Waste Management National Services
12 Greenway Plaza, Suite 210
Houston, TX 77046 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Werner Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
West Lawrence Street, LLC by their managing agent Lokre Development Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wolf Creek Center, LLC
818 Tara Plaza
Papillion, NE 68046 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Joshua K. Benn
Duff & Phelps Securities, LLC 55 East 52nd Street, 31st Floor
New York, NY 10055 |
|
Financial Advisor
Paul Huygens
Province, Inc. 2360 Corporate Circle, Suite 330
Henderson, NV 89074 |
|
Financial Advisor
Joseph Marchese
Clear Thinking Group, LLC 401 Towne Center Drive
Hillsborough, NJ 08844 |
|
Interested Party
Blue Springs Development Three, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Brian Brager
Bradford Capital Management LLC 1051 Bloomfield Ave., Suite 10
Clifton, NJ 07012 |
|
Interested Party
Cutie Pie Baby
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ed Miller & Sons, Inc.
McGill Gotsdiner Workman & Lepp 11404 W. Dodge Road, Suite 500
Omaha, NE 68154 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Emo-Trans, Inc.
135 Guy Lombardo Avenue
Freeport, NY 11520 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC
777 Third Avenue 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
|
Interested Party
Flyp Sportswear, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Great American Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hilco Merchant Resources, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Infovisionix, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
JPMCC 2006-LDP7 Centro Enfield, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jeff Gordman Advisory L.L.C.
Box 103254915
Sioux Falls, SD 57186 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Nebraska Department of Revenue
P.O. Box 94818
Lincoln, NE 68509 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Papillion Development, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
RetailMeNot, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Specialty Retailers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Stage Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission
Sonia Chae 175 W. Jackson Blvd. Suite 1450
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Venture Investment Partners, LLC
McGuire, Craddock & Strother, PC 2501 N. Harwood, Suite 1800
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Other Professional
META Advisors LLC
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Patricia Fahey
U.S. Trustee's Office 111 So 18th Plz Suite 1148
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Jerry Jensen
Acting Assistant UST U.S. Trustee's Office 111 South 18th Plz, Suite 1148
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Represented By
|
1. | Midwestern apparel and home décor retailer Gordmans files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (retaildive.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/13/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 12:02 PM CDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
1865 | 1865
misc
Chapter 11 Non Small Business Post-Confirmation Report
Mon 04/15 4:41 PM
Chapter 11 Non Small Business Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 17-80306 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC. (Koenig, Brian) |
|
1864 | 1864
misc
Chapter 11 Non Small Business Post-Confirmation Report
Mon 04/15 4:39 PM
Chapter 11 Non Small Business Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Brian J. Koenig on behalf of META Advisors LLC. (Koenig, Brian) |