Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-80306 |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Plan Confirmed: | Oct 18, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
1926 S 67th St
Omaha, NE 68106-2800 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Patricia Fahey
U.S. Trustee's Office 111 So 18th Plz Suite 1148
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 12:02 PM CDT |
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
utility
Corrective Entry-Wrong Case
Mon 04/16 8:13 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: THE AMENDED PROOF OF CLAIM #2 WAS FILED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR. ALL CLAIMS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE NO. 17-80304 (nmw) |
||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
utility
Corrective Entry-Wrong Case
Mon 04/17 8:16 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: THE PROOF OF CLAIM #2 WAS FILED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR. ALL CLAIMS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE NO. 17-80304 (nmw) |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
Entry
Tue 03/28 1:37 PM
ENTRY MADE IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. . (nmw) |
|
utility
Corrective Entry-Wrong Case
Tue 03/28 7:50 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: THE PLEADING WAS FILED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR. ALL PLEADINGS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE NO. 17-80304 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Mon 03/27 8:00 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual ; and Global Notes, Methodology and Specific Disclosures Regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs Filed by Lisa Peters on behalf of Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Peters, Lisa) INCORRECT CASE. Modified on 3/28/2017 (nmw) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Schedule A/B
Mon 03/27 7:45 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G: Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual- Codebtors ; and Global Notes, Methodology and Specific Disclosures Regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs Filed by Lisa Peters on behalf of Gordmans Management Company, Inc.. (Peters, Lisa) INCORRECT CASE. Modified on 3/28/2017 (nmw) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Corrective Entry
Fri 03/24 11:59 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: THE PROOF OF CLAIM #1 WAS FILED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR. ALL CLAIMS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE NO. 17-80304 (nmw) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Joint Administration
Mon 03/13 9:53 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Filed by Debtor . An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Gordmans Stores, Inc.; Gordmans, Inc.; Gordmans Management Company, Inc.; Gordmans Distribution Company, Inc.; Gordmans Intermediate Holdings Corp; and Gordmans LLC. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 17-80304 (TLS). ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration
Mon 03/13 5:10 AM
Motion for Joint Administration and Related Relief Filed by Debtor Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Peters, Lisa) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 03/13 5:03 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-80306 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 7100907, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/13 4:50 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/11/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 07/11/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 03/27/2017. Filed by Jeffry T. Wegner on behalf of Gordmans Management Company, Inc..(Peters, Lisa) INCORRECT ATTORNEY LOGIN/PASSWORD WAS USED AT CASE OPENING. ATTORNEY JEFFREY WEGNER WILL BE ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR THE DEBTORS. Modified on 3/13/2017 (nmw) |
|
utility
Add Judge
Mon 03/13 8:06 AM
Judge Thomas L. Saladino added to case . (nmw) |