26 Hawthorne Avenue Corp.
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert E Grossman |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-71443 |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2017 |
Debtor
26 Hawthorne Avenue Corp.
26 Hawthorne Ave
Ronkonkoma, NY 11779-5902 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Marc A Pergament
Weinberg Gross & Pergament 400 Garden City Plaza Suite 403
Garden City, NY 11530 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
Docket last updated: 03/13/2017 12:02 PM EDT |