|
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 06/15 12:24 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (sld)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal
Mon 05/01 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Notice Date 04/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
order
Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal
Fri 04/28 11:14 AM
Order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal Related [+]. Signed on 4/28/2017 (cam)
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Thu 04/27 11:23 AM
Hearing Held; Appearance by Stan Yan Related [+] Case to be Dismissed. Submit Order(cmoffett)
|
12
|
|
12
misc
Letter
Mon 04/03 8:27 AM
Letter of adjourment of 341 meeting Filed by Stan Y Yang (Yang, Stan)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
trustee
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors
Mon 04/03 8:29 AM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Filed by Stan Y Yang. 341(a) Meeting Adjourned to 4/21/2017 at 11:00 AM at Room 562, 560 Federal Plaza, CI, NY. (Yang, Stan)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Mon 04/03 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 04/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
order
Schedule Hearing (Generic)
Fri 03/31 3:15 PM
Order to Schedule Hearing to consider dismissal or conversion of this chapter 11 case. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Signed on 3/31/2017(cam)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Sat 03/18 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 03/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Thu 03/16 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 03/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 03/16 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing
Thu 03/16 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Notice Date 03/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
order
Generic Order
Wed 03/15 10:55 AM
Order Directing Debtor to Obtain Counsel and to File Schedules no later then March 30, 2017. if the Debtor fails to comply with this Order, the Court maydismiss this chapter 11 case without further notic Related [+]. Signed on 3/15/2017 (cam)
|
4
|
|
4
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Mon 03/13 12:42 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at Room 562, 560 Federal Plaza, CI, NY. (srm)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Mon 03/13 12:38 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 3/13/2017.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 3/13/2017. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 3/13/2017. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 3/13/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 3/13/2017. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 3/13/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 3/27/2017. Schedule A/B due 3/27/2017. Schedule D due 3/27/2017. Schedule E/F due 3/27/2017. Schedule G due 3/27/2017. Schedule H due 3/27/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 3/27/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/27/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 3/27/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 3/27/2017. (srm)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/13 12:35 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1717 Filed by Roosevelt Properties Inc. Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/11/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 7/11/2017. (srm)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Mon 03/13 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1717.00. Receipt Number 249848. (SM) (admin)
Related: [-]
|