Bruce v. United States of America
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William T Moore, Jr |
Referred: | G R Smith |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00049 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 31, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 08/31 9:21 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/31/17. (jlm) (jlm) |
|
Att: 1 (8/31/2017) Correct Judgment | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Vacate
Wed 08/30 4:56 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendations re6 Report and Recommendations; denying1 Motion to Vacate. In addition, the Court DECLINES to issue a Certificate of Appealability ("COA") in this case. As a result, any request by Petitioner for leave to appeal in forma pauperis would be moot. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/30/17. (jlm) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 07/18 9:07 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying1 MOTION to Vacate filed by Larron R. Bruce. Objections to R&R due by 8/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/18/17. (jlm) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Fri 05/12 2:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Bruce's 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion by United States of America. Responses due by 5/26/2017. (Stuchell, James) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/12 4:38 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re1 MOTION to Vacate. Responses due by 5/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/12/17. (jlm) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/12 9:29 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 MOTION to Vacate by United States of America. Responses due by 4/26/2017.(Gilluly, E.) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Wed 04/12 11:49 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 MOTION to Vacate (jrb) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 03/14 4:29 PM
ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Government to respond within thirty days from the date of this Order. (Compliance due by 4/13/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/14/17. (jlm) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Vacate
Mon 03/13 1:43 PM
MOTION to Vacate by Larron R. Bruce. Responses due by 3/27/2017. REFERRED to Judge G. R. Smith.(jlm) |