Multiband Field Services, Inc. DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. Jointly Administered under Case #Y17-31575-H1-11. This message does not apply to adversary proceedings or claims registers.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-31575
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-31575
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-31577 |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Multiband Field Services, Inc.
2801 Network Blvd Ste 300
Frisco, TX 75034-1881 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago |
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 09/18 4:17 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ltie) |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Wed 01/24 9:54 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 12 of Multiband Field Services, Inc by Steve Albritton (ShoshanaArnow) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
10
pgs
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Tue 10/17 10:42 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 10 (smur) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Fri 07/07 11:47 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 9 |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
2553
pgs
misc
Statement
Thu 03/16 4:08 PM
Statement Verification of Consolidated Creditor Matrix (Filed By Multiband Field Services, Inc. ). (Pezanosky, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 03/16 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 03/16 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Initial Order Complex Chapter 11
Mon 03/13 2:02 PM
Order Granting Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Treatment signed on 3/13/2017 (smur) |
|
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Emergency
Mon 03/13 1:39 PM
Order (A) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (B) Granting Related Relief Signed on 3/13/2017. (smur) |
|
2 | 2
8
pgs
motion
Emergency Motion
Mon 03/13 12:00 PM
Emergency Motion Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (B) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. (Pezanosky, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
22
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Mon 03/13 10:22 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Multiband Field Services, Inc.. (Pezanosky, Stephen) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 03/13 10:23 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-31577 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18813233. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Case Reassigned
Mon 03/13 1:40 PM
Judge Marvin Isgur added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated (smur) |