Colvin v. Judge Norma et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Darrow |
Referred: | Jonathan E Hawley |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-04079 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:19 AM CDT |
Defendant
Officer John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Matthew Durbin
|
|
Defendant
Barren Hientz
|
|
Defendant
Dr. John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Judge Farbe
|
|
Defendant
Judge Norma
|
|
Defendant
Public Defender's Office
|
|
Defendant
State's Attorney Officer (prosecutor)
|
|
Defendant
Kirk Witherspoon
|
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Colvin, Sr
M46512 CHESTER Chester Mental Health Center Inmate Mail/Parcels 1315 Lehmen Drive
Chester, IL 62233 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 05/22 9:02 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re Judgment7 . Envelope mailed to Plaintiff marked "Return to Sender, unable to forward, gone". (KB, ilcd) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Judgment
Tue 05/09 9:30 AM
JUDGMENT entered. (KB, ilcd) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Request Counsel
Wed 05/03 11:53 AM
ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on May 3, 2017. Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. 1983 claims against public defenders Hientz and Durbin, Judges Norma and Farbe, Assistant State's Attorney Doe in his official capacity, and Police Detective Doe are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's section 1983 claims against Dr. Witherspoon, Dr. Doe, and Assistant State's Attorney Doe in his individual capacity are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff's fee will be collected as described in the Order. Plaintiff's3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment and close the case. (HR, ilcd) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger
Fri 03/17 10:09 AM
+++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (LN, ilcd) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Mon 03/13 1:43 PM
Letter from Clerk requesting trust fund ledgers. (ED, ilcd) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Request Counsel
Mon 03/13 1:35 PM
MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Brandon Colvin, Sr. Responses due by 3/27/2017. (ED, ilcd) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/13 1:34 PM
PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Brandon Colvin, Sr.(ED, ilcd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Brandon Colvin, Sr.(ED, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 envelope, | ||
Att: 2 exh 1, | ||
Att: 3 exh 2 |