|
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 01/22 7:58 AM
***Civil Case Terminated.(ydm)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 01/19 2:51 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Amanda Fluderer. (Williams, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 07/20 4:03 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Susan Bassford Wilson on behalf of Corefirst Bank & Trust. (Bassford Wilson, Susan)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/12 3:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time is 4-5 days. Discovery deadline 2/28/2018. Dispositive motion deadline 3/28/2018. Mediation deadline 11/13/2017. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 8/18/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/7/2018. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2018 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2018 at 09:30 AM by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 7/12/17. (bh)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 07/12 2:56 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/12/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
order
Setting Scheduling Conference
Thu 05/25 10:57 AM
INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2017 at 2:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting and copies of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due to the magistrate judge by 7/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 5/25/17. (bh)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/15 5:13 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Corefirst Bank & Trust identifying Commerce Bank and Trust Holding Company as corporate parent . (Lake, Heather)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/15 5:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Corefirst Bank & Trust.(Lake, Heather)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
order
Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer
Thu 04/27 3:12 PM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until May 15, 2017 for Defendant Corefirst Bank & Trust to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 04/27/2017. (cv)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 04/27 1:06 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Heather M. Lake on behalf of Corefirst Bank & Trust (Lake, Heather)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED
Wed 04/19 10:12 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Amanda Fluderer upon Corefirst Bank & Trust served on 4/10/2017, answer due 5/1/2017 (Williams, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 03/13 3:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Amanda Fluderer. (Williams, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint (attorney)
Mon 03/13 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4118858.), filed by Amanda Fluderer.(Williams, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
|
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 03/13 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cv)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 4:39 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Corefirst Bank & Trust. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (cv)
Related: [-]
|