Ward v. Reser's Fine Foods, Inc.
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Teresa J James |
Referred: | Teresa J James |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-04020 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
Reser's Fine Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Otis Ward
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 10/24 9:11 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per Journal Entry of Dismissal with Prejudice 21 .(cv) |
||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 10/23 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Reser's Fine Foods, Inc. (Fogleman, Alan) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
trial
Expert Witness Designation
Fri 09/01 10:44 AM
EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION by Reser's Fine Foods, Inc..(Fogleman, Alan) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/27 9:31 AM
Joint NOTICE of Mediation by Reser's Fine Foods, Inc. (Fogleman, Alan) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
trial
Expert Witness Designation
Thu 07/20 2:27 PM
EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION by Otis Ward.(Fincher, Roger) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Fri 07/07 3:29 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Reser's Fine Foods, Inc. of taking deposition of Otis Ward on August 18, 2017 (Bowles, Byron) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/23 10:39 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Response to Admissions from Defendant by Otis Ward. (Fincher, Roger) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Fri 06/09 1:35 PM
ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE. Upon the unopposed request of Defendant, the mediation deadline is hereby extended to 9/29/2017 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/9/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Service
Fri 06/09 6:36 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Otis Ward of Discovery Responses (Fincher, Roger) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 05/08 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Reser's Fine Foods, Inc. of Deft's First Request for Admissions, First Interrogatories, First Request for Production and Request for Statement of Monetary Damages (Fogleman, Alan) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/03 2:04 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice FILED or Confidential Settlement Reports EMAILED to Magistrate Judge O'Hara by 7/31/2017. Mediation deadline 8/31/2017. Discovery deadline 10/3/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2017 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Dial 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386. Dispositive motion deadline 11/20/2017. Court Trial is estimated to take 4 days and is set for 6/12/2018 at 09:00 AM in Topeka Courtroom (Unknown) before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/3/2017. (byk) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Consent & Order to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 05/02 3:21 PM
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER - Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 5/2/17. (daw) |
|
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/02 2:57 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice FILED or Confidential Settlement Reports EMAILED to Magistrate Judge by 7/31/2017.(ksd_james_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov). Mediation deadline 8/31/2017. Discovery deadline 10/3/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2017 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Dial 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386. Dispositive motion deadline 11/20/2017. Court Trial is estimated to take 4 days and is set for 8/7/2018 at 09:00 AM in Topeka Courtroom 401 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/2/2017. (ck) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 04/25 11:23 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held by telephone on 4/25/2017. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/17 5:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Otis Ward. (Fincher, Roger) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/17 4:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Service of Defendant's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Reser's Fine Foods, Inc.. (Fogleman, Alan) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Setting Scheduling Conference
Mon 03/20 4:46 PM
INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. The conference will be held by telephone. Participating counsel must dial 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 4/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/20/2017. (byk) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/13 11:38 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reser's Fine Foods, Inc. identifying Reser's Fine Foods, Inc. as corporate parent . (Fogleman, Alan) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/13 11:37 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by Reser's Fine Foods, Inc..(Fogleman, Alan) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 03/13 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Reser's Fine Foods, Inc. of Notice of Filing (Fogleman, Alan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 03/13 11:09 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Reser's Fine Foods, Inc.. (Fogleman, Alan) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/13 11:08 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Shawhnee County, KS, case number 2016-CV-000896 Trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4118328.), filed by Reser's Fine Foods, Inc..(Fogleman, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 03/13 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (daw) |