Cook v. Crownover
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | J Thomas Marten |
Referred: | Kenneth G Gale |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-01059 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
Rocky Crownover
|
|
Plaintiff
Shay Dee Cook
141 W Elm
Wichita, KS 67203 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment
Wed 06/14 10:58 AM
JUDGMENT. In accordance with the Memorandum and Order filed June 12, 2017, the court adopts the Report and Recommendation, and the present action is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by deputy clerk on 06/14/2017. (aa) |
|
notice
Notice Re Pro Se Mailing
Wed 06/14 11:00 AM
NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document10 Judgment,9 Order on Report and Recommendations mailed to: Shay Dee Cook at 141 W. Elm, Wichita, Kansas 67203 on 6/14/2017 by regular mail. (aa) |
||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Mon 06/12 9:25 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting6 Report and Recommendations. The present action is hereby DISMISSED this 9th day of June, 2017. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 06/09/2017. (aa) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Fri 04/28 4:08 PM
OBJECTION to6 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Shay Dee Cook. (mam) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 04/19 9:44 AM
RETURN MAIL received re Notice Re Pro Se Mailing of5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER,6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS addressed to Shay Dee Cook (not remailed). (mam) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 04/14 9:33 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of dismissal re1 Complaint filed by Shay Dee Cook. This document also serves as the Memorandum & Order5 granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The document is included in the Court's filing system twice for administrative/tracking purposes. Objections to R&R due by 4/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/14/17. Mailed to pro se party Shay Dee Cook by regular mail. (df) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/14 9:29 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This document also serves as the Report & Recommendation of dismissal of Plaintiff's claims to the District Court. The document is included in the Court's filing system for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/14/17. Mailed to pro se party Shay Dee Cook by regular mail. (df) |
|
notice
Notice Re Pro Se Mailing
Fri 04/14 10:23 AM
NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis,6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Shay Dee Cook mailed to Shay Dee Cook on 4/14/2017 by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number 7012 3050 0001 1190 3214. (aa) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Financial Affidavit
Tue 04/04 8:24 AM
(NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Shay Dee Cook. (mam) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/04 8:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Shay Dee Cook. (mam) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/13 3:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shay Dee Cook . NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (mam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Shay Dee Cook (No Summons Issued). (mam) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 03/13 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Civil cover sheet and Affidavit of Financial Status are missing. The filing party is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. Mailed to Shay Dee Cook by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam) |