Beyonce v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02073 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Beyonce
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/10 3:09 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice- originally filed as rec. doc. 17741 in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(dw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 10:42 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 11:21 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG.(ss) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Mon 03/13 11:17 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint, **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (ss) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/13 10:06 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 9:58 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6019408) filed by Cynthia Beyonc.Attorney Amanda K. Klevorn added to party Cynthia Beyonc(pty:pla).(Klevorn, Amanda) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/13/2017) (ss). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/13/2017) (ss). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/13/2017) (ss). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/13/2017) (ss). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/13/2017) (ss). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/13/2017) (ss) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bayer Pharma AG, | ||
Att: 3 Summons BHCP |