Oceaneering International, Inc. v. Myrtle L/B et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jay C Zainey |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02078 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Marine Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 5:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jill L/B
|
|
Defendant
Montco Offshore Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Myrtle L/B
|
|
Defendant
Robert L/B
|
|
Plaintiff
Oceaneering International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order Staying Case
Fri 06/23 10:01 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE pending proceedings in the Bankruptcy case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mark these actions CLOSED for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/21/2017.(ajn) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 03/28 8:11 AM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. The above matter is hereby consolidated with 2:17-cv-01921-JCZ-KWR. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation ALL CASES if it applies to all cases. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/27/2017. (ajn) (ajn) |
|
33 | 33
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 03/27 4:53 PM
REPLY filed by Montco Offshore Inc, Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC re18 MOTION to Vacate Arrest and Recognize Automatic Stay. (ajn) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 03/27 4:50 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/27/2017. (ajn) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 03/24 11:48 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Montco Offshore Inc, Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC.(Emmett, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion to Transfer Case
Fri 03/24 9:12 AM
ORDERED that the24 Motion to Transfer Case is GRANTED. Case reassigned to Judge Jay C. Zainey. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman no longer assigned to the case. FURTHER ORDERED that the March 24, 2017 expedited submission date on the defendants' motion to vacate arrest and recognize stay of proceedings is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/23/2017. (NEF: SECTION A, SECTION F)(clc) |
|
29 | 29
order
Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 03/23 11:11 AM
ORDERED that the25 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Transfer filed by Oceaneering International, Inc. is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Motion to Transfer be set for submission on March 24, 2017 on the papers and that any opposition be submitted on or before March 24, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/23/2017.(clc) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Thu 03/23 10:41 AM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Montco Offshore Inc, Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC re24 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Emmett, John) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Thu 03/23 9:32 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re24 MOTION to Transfer Case .** Filing attorney selected incorrect submission/hearing date. Correct date is 4/19/2017. Clerk took corrective action.** (clc) |
|
26 | 26
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Thu 03/23 8:39 AM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Oceaneering International, Inc. re18 MOTION to Vacate Arrest and Recognize Automatic Stay .(Fenasci, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Expedite
Wed 03/22 12:01 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Transfer by Oceaneering International, Inc..(Fenasci, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
24 | 24
motion
Transfer Case
Wed 03/22 10:58 AM
MOTION to Transfer Case by Oceaneering International, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/22/2017.(Fenasci, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Notice of Submission | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
discov
Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint)
Tue 03/21 12:38 PM
Return of Service of Vessel Arrest served on Jill M/V on 3/14/2017(clc) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order
Mon 03/20 2:22 PM
CORRECTED ORDER: ORDERED that the20 MOTION to Expedite Hearing filed by Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC, Montco Offshore Inc is Granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the18 Motion to Vacate Arrest and Recognize Stay of Proceedings will be deemed submitted as of the close of business on March 24, 2017. FURTHER ORDERED that any opposition Memorandum be filed not later than 9:00 a.m. on March 23, 2017. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/20/2017.(clc) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 03/20 12:56 PM
ORDERED that the20 MOTION to Expedite Hearing filed by Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC, Montco Offshore Inc is Granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the18 Motion to Vacate Arrest and Recognize Stay of Proceedings will be deemed submitted as of the close of business on March 24, 2017. FURTHER ORDERED that any opposition Memorandum be filed not later than 9:00 a.m. on March 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/20/2017.(clc) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Expedite
Fri 03/17 11:17 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Amended MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Montco Offshore Inc, Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC.(Emmett, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
motion
Expedite
Fri 03/17 10:47 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Montco Offshore Inc, Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC.(Emmett, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
motion
Vacate
Fri 03/17 10:46 AM
MOTION to Vacate Arrest and Recognize Automatic Stay by Montco Offshore Inc, Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/5/2017.Attorney John F. Emmett added to party Montco Offshore Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John F. Emmett added to party Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC(pty:dft).(Emmett, John) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Submission | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/17 10:44 AM
NOTICE by Montco Offshore Inc, Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC of Automatic Stay .(Emmett, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/16 3:27 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Permit Repair Operations and Movement of Vessels. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/16/2017. (3cc: USM) (clc) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian
Thu 03/16 3:22 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/16/2017. (3cc: USM) (clc) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/16 11:02 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Permit Repair Operations and Movement of Vessels by Oceaneering International, Inc..(McGlone, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appoint/Substitute Custodian
Thu 03/16 10:42 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by Oceaneering International, Inc..(McGlone, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Memorandum
Wed 03/15 4:38 PM
Memorandum by Oceaneering International, Inc.(McGlone, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Pleading, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Pleading | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/15 9:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Montco Offshore Inc, Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC.(clc) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Request for Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 4:38 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC filed by Oceaneering International, Inc. re1 Complaint,,. (Fenasci, Brett) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Tue 03/14 4:35 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Fenasci, Brett) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Warrant Issued
Mon 03/13 3:04 PM
Warrant Issued for service on Vessel. (Jill L/B) (3cc: USM)(clc) |
|
7 | 7
service
Seizure Warrant Issued
Mon 03/13 2:54 PM
Warrant Issued for service on Vessel (Robert L/B). (3cc: USM)(clc) |
|
6 | 6
service
Seizure Warrant Issued
Mon 03/13 2:52 PM
Warrant Issued for service on Vessel (Myrtle L/B). (3cc: USM) (clc) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem
Mon 03/13 2:49 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/13/17. (3cc: USM)(clc) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Mon 03/13 12:45 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint. ****Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have thegreen header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in theapplicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (clc) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/13 12:24 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (jeg) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem
Mon 03/13 12:20 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by Oceaneering International, Inc..(Fenasci, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 12:14 PM
COMPLAINT against L/B JILL, L/B MYRTLE, L/B ROBERT, Montco Offshore Inc, Montco Oilfield Contractors, Inc. (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Oceaneering International, Inc..Attorney Brett P. Fenasci added to party Oceaneering International, Inc.(pty:pet).(Fenasci, Brett) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/13/2017) (clc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 03/13 12:21 PM
Filing fee received from Oceaneering International, Inc.: (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 43819) (jeg) |