Bespoke, LLC v. Garth Piesse
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02080 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 5:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
Garth Piesse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bespoke, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
AO 120 Final Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
Wed 02/21 9:33 AM
AO 120 Final Report Regarding Patent & Trademark. (ecm) |
|
23 | 23
order
Judgment
Wed 02/21 9:32 AM
JUDGMENT that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ecm) |
|
22 | 22
14
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Party
Tue 02/20 4:24 PM
ORDER AND REASONS granting11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's request for discovery and transfer are DENIED. The case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/30 10:34 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ari Meltzer. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/30 10:34 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David E Weslow. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 08/24 2:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Garth Piesse re11 Second MOTION to Dismiss Party Garth Piesse for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted .(ecm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 08/24 1:59 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 08/23 5:36 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss . (Patrick, Patrick) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 08/23 4:17 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Garth Piesse.(McGoey, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Mr. Piesse's Third Declaration | ||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/22 4:36 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mr. Ari Meltzer (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-6320690) by Garth Piesse.(McGoey, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit - Meltzer Declaration | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/22 4:29 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mr. David Weslow (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-6320668) by Garth Piesse.(McGoey, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Weslow Declaration | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 08/15 11:21 AM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Bespoke, LLC re11 Second MOTION to Dismiss Party Garth Piesse for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted .(Patrick, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Travis Simpson | ||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Party
Wed 08/09 12:10 PM
ORDER denying as moot9 First Motion to Dismiss Party. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Party
Tue 08/08 3:17 PM
Second MOTION to Dismiss Party Garth Piesse for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Garth Piesse. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/23/2017.(McGoey, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Notice of Submission | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 08/01 4:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Garth Piesse filed by Bespoke, LLC.(Patrick, Patrick) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Party
Fri 07/28 6:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Party Garth Piesse for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Garth Piesse. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/23/2017.Attorney Thomas J. McGoey, II added to party Garth Piesse(pty:dft).(McGoey, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Notice of Submission | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/16 3:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Garth Piesse.(ecm) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Request for Summons Issued
Thu 06/08 9:35 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Garth Piesse filed by Bespoke, LLC re1 Complaint,. (Patrick, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 03/15 11:42 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re3 MOTION Request for Service by Clerk of Court ; Incorrect event. Filing attorney should have used the service of process event "Request for Summons Issued". Clerk modified docket text. (ecm) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 2:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Garth Piesse. (mf) |
|
4 | 4
misc
AO 120 Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
Tue 03/14 10:40 AM
AO 120 Report Regarding Patent & Trademark. Modified on 3/14/2017 (mf) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/14 8:33 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Request for Service by Clerk of Court by Bespoke, LLC. (Patrick, Patrick) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/13 2:56 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (jeg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 12:21 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Garth PIESSE (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6020149) filed by Bespoke, LLC.Attorney Patrick Hannon Patrick added to party Bespoke, LLC(pty:selreq).(Patrick, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |