Denson v. Social Security Administration
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah S Vance |
Referred: | Daniel E Knowles, III |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02083 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2017 |
Defendant
Social Security Administration
|
|
Plaintiff
Walter Denson
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment
Tue 08/01 4:32 PM
JUDGMENT - Considering the Court's order and reason on file herein, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff's case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/1/2017.(cg) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/01 1:18 PM
ORDER AND REASONS ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS10 . Accordingly, defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED, and plaintiff's case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/1/2017.(cg) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/30 4:52 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Social Security Administration; IT IS RECOMMENDED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as Untimely [Doc. #8] be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 7/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 6/30/2017. (cms) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
Mon 06/05 10:29 AM
ORDER that Defendant's8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as Untimely is SET FOR SUBMISSION ON THE BRIEFS before the undersigned Magistrate Judge on Wednesday, June 14, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. There will be no oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 6/5/2017.(cms) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 05/24 4:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Social Security Administration. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/14/2017.Attorney Jason M. Bigelow added to party Social Security Administration(pty:dft).(Bigelow, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Submission | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/03 2:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney General served on 3/28/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. (ajn) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA
Wed 03/29 2:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney Office served on 3/24/2017, answer due 5/23/2017. (cg) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA
Wed 03/29 2:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 3/24/2017, answer due 5/23/2017 (cg) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 12:10 PM
3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (cms) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 11:53 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 3/14/2017. (cms) |
|
Att: 1 Pauper Letter | ||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/13 3:23 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Walter Denson. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (tm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Walter Denson.(tm) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |