Broyles v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02090 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 5:14 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Broyles
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
30+
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 10/21 10:24 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE per Order rec. doc. 17359 filed in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/15/2019.(dw) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 10:46 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 9:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG.(mf) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/13 4:46 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6021600) filed by Ronald Broyles.Attorney Avram Josef Blair added to party Ronald Broyles(pty:pla).(Blair, Avram) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |