Louann Grady v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02091 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 5:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Louann Grady
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/10 3:46 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice- originally filed as rec. doc. 17741 in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(dw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 10:46 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 10:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharamecuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC. (mf) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/13 4:48 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6021676) filed by Louann Grady, as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Grady, Deceased.Attorney William L. Bross added to party Louann Grady, as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Grady, Deceased(pty:pla).(Bross, William) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons |