Green v. Dollar General et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Martin Lc Feldman |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02101 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 25, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
DG Louisiana, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unidentified Party
|
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Green
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Dollar General
Terminated: 03/13/2017
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
121 | 121
order
Judgment
Mon 02/25 3:41 PM
JUDGMENT - In accordance with the Court's Order and Reasons granting defendant's motion for summary judgment,118 ; accordingly, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that there be judgment in favor of defendant DG Louisiana, LLC and against plaintiff Pamela Green, DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/25/2019.(cbs) |
|
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
120 | 120
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 02/20 3:55 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by DG Louisiana, LLC re110 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Peter Liechty .(jeg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
119 | 119
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 02/20 3:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING117 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/20/2019. (jeg) |
|
118 | 118
18
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion in Limine
Wed 02/20 1:21 PM
ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING109 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that110 Motion in Limine is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/20/2019. (jeg) |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
117 | 117
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 02/19 5:31 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion in Limine To Exclude Testimony of Dr. Peter Liechty by DG Louisiana, LLC.(Estrada, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
116 | 116
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 02/19 3:40 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by DG Louisiana, LLC re109 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(jeg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
115 | 115
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 02/19 3:33 PM
ORDER granting114 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/19/2019. (jeg) |
|
Monday, February 18, 2019 | ||
114 | 114
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 02/18 6:40 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by DG Louisiana, LLC.(Estrada, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit |